Reports for KOMET Werbeagentur AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout KOMET Werbeagentur AG
- KOMET Werbeagentur AG with its legal headquarters in Bern is active. KOMET Werbeagentur AG operates in the sector «Advertising services».
- The company was founded on 13.01.1993.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 03.01.2024.
- In the commercial register the company KOMET Werbeagentur AG is registered under the UID CHE-102.089.224.
- At the moment, the company KOMET Werbeagentur AG has 2 various trademarks or applications in the IPI database.
- Companies with the same address as KOMET Werbeagentur AG: Association Spitex privée Suisse (ASPS), Herr Durst GmbH, Karin B. Meyer GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.01.1993
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.003.344-1
UID/VAT
CHE-102.089.224
Sector
Advertising services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Beratung von anderen Unternehmen in den Bereichen Marketing und Werbung; sie kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Bommer + Partner Treuhand KLG | Bern | 20.04.2018 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
WR Wirtschafts-Revisions AG | Bern | 25.04.2014 | 19.04.2018 | |
EWS Verwaltungen AG | Wohlen bei Bern | <2004 | 24.04.2014 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Cosmic Werbeagentur Bern AG
- Benefit Direct Marketing AG
- Benefit Direct Marketing AG.
- Carat Direct Marketing AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
KOMET | 04.03.2011 | active | 50741/2011 |
Soirée graphique | - | deleted | 00265/2015 |
Newest SOGC notifications: KOMET Werbeagentur AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005924339, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
KOMET Werbeagentur AG, in Bern, CHE-102.089.224, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 111 vom 11.06.2021, Publ. 1005214216).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Durst, Moritz, von Basel, in Zürich, Mitglied und Sekretär des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Durst, Marcel, von Basel, in Bern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005214216, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
KOMET Werbeagentur AG, in Bern, CHE-102.089.224, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 28 vom 11.02.2020, Publ. 1004826942).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Diezi, Gabriel, von Berlingen, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Durst, Moritz, von Basel, in Zürich, Mitglied und Sekretär des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004826942, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
KOMET Werbeagentur AG, in Bern, CHE-102.089.224, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 212 vom 01.11.2019, Publ. 1004750139).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gerber, Jeffrey Christoph, von Langnau im Emmental, in Bern, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hert, Corinne, von Messen, in Bern, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit einem Mitglied].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.