Reports for KOCHER-CONSULTING Versicherungstreuhand AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout KOCHER-CONSULTING Versicherungstreuhand AG
- KOCHER-CONSULTING Versicherungstreuhand AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Oensingen. KOCHER-CONSULTING Versicherungstreuhand AG belongs to the industry «Services for insurance and pensions» and is currently active.
- KOCHER-CONSULTING Versicherungstreuhand AG was founded on 24.06.2004.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 29.01.2019.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of SO under the UID CHE-111.731.249.
- There are 21 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Ackermann Beteiligungen AG, Ackermann Immo AG, Airzone GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.06.2004
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Oensingen
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-241.3.004.243-7
UID/VAT
CHE-111.731.249
Sector
Services for insurance and pensions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Beratung in Versicherungsfragen, Vermittlung von Versicherungen, Verwaltung und Revision von Versicherungsportefeuilles, Vorsorgeplanungen, Maklertätigkeit sowie alle weiteren Tätigkeiten, die der Gesellschaft von Nutzen sein können. Kann sich an andern Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, Grundstücke erwerben, überbauen, halten und veräussern sowie im In- und Ausland Tochtergesellschaften und Zweigniederlassungen errichten.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Legaudit AG | Solothurn | 30.06.2004 | 30.12.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: KOCHER-CONSULTING Versicherungstreuhand AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004553287, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
KOCHER-CONSULTING Versicherungstreuhand AG, in Oensingen, CHE-111.731.249, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 135 vom 16.07.2018, Publ. 4360405).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kammer, Peter, von Lauterbrunnen, in Feldbrunnen (Feldbrunnen-St. Niklaus), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kocher, Hans-Peter, von Büren an der Aare, in Oensingen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Zarbo, Jean-Pierre, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Niederbipp, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Zuchwil, ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 4360405, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
KOCHER-CONSULTING Versicherungstreuhand AG, in Oensingen, CHE-111.731.249, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 195 vom 08.10.2012, Publ. 6880820).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bardelli, Guido, von Langenthal, in Langenthal, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 6880820, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
KOCHER-CONSULTING Versicherungstreuhand AG, in Oensingen, CH-241.3.004.243-7, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 68 vom 06.04.2011, S. 0, Publ. 6108940).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kocher, Hans-Peter, von Büren an der Aare, in Oensingen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates und Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift];
Bardelli, Guido, von Langenthal, in Langenthal, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Kammer, Peter, von Lauterbrunnen, in Feldbrunnen (Feldbrunnen-St. Niklaus), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.