Reports for Koch Enterprise GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Koch Enterprise GmbH
- Koch Enterprise GmbH is active in the industry «Trading in consumer goods» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Hünenberg See.
- The management of the company Koch Enterprise GmbH, which was founded on the 04.10.2006, consists of 2 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 29.03.2019.
- Koch Enterprise GmbH is registered in the Canton of ZG under the UID CHE-113.195.617.
- On the same address as Koch Enterprise GmbH there are 24 other active companies registered. These include: AVT Anlage, Verwaltung & Technologie GmbH, BBLUM GMBH, BUTTERFLY events & more GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.10.2006
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Hünenberg
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.4.006.685-6
UID/VAT
CHE-113.195.617
Sector
Trading in consumer goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit Bettwaren, Gesundheitsartikeln, Magnetfeldtherapieprodukten, Wellnessprodukten, Textilien und Elektroartikeln; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- E3 Projektierung Beteiligung GmbH
- Mihedy GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Koch Enterprise GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004598846, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
E3 Projektierung Beteiligung GmbH, in Hünenberg, CHE-113.195.617, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 32 vom 15.02.2019, Publ. 1004567515).
Statutenänderung:
14.03.2019.
Firma neu:
Koch Enterprise GmbH.
Zweck neu:
Handel mit Bettwaren, Gesundheitsartikeln, Magnetfeldtherapieprodukten, Wellnessprodukten, Textilien und Elektroartikeln;
vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten. [Ferner Änderung nicht publikationspflichtiger Tatsachen].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Koch, Sascha Renée, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Lastrup (DE), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Nagel, Marc, von Arth, in Hünenberg, Direktor, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].
Publication number: HR02-1004567515, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
E3 Projektierung Beteiligung GmbH, in Hünenberg, CHE-113.195.617, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 229 vom 24.11.2017, Publ. 3890629).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Grob, Jakob Willi, von Neckertal, in Beringen, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Nagel, Marc, von Arth, in Hünenberg, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].
Publication number: 3890629, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
E3 Projektierung Beteiligung GmbH, in Hünenberg, CHE-113.195.617, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 135 vom 16.07.2013, Publ. 980155).
Domizil neu:
Eichmattstrasse 97, 6333 Hünenberg See.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Nagel, Marc, von Arth, in Hünenberg, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Grob, Jakob Willi, von Neckertal, in Beringen, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.