Reports for Kinderschutz Schweiz
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Kinderschutz Schweiz
- Kinderschutz Schweiz is a Foundation with its legal headquarters in Bern. Kinderschutz Schweiz belongs to the industry «Other social services» and is currently active.
- The management consists of 10 persons. The organization was founded on 15.12.2008.
- The organization has last modified its commercial register entry on 18.09.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-114.634.795.
- The organization Kinderschutz Schweiz has currently registered 2 different trademarks or applications for trademarks.
Management (10)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Beat Reichlin,
Markus Wicki,
Andreas Dworak Ruflin,
Marie Agnès Schäfer-Altiparmakian,
Simone Müller
newest authorized signatories
Samuel Eastus,
Beat Reichlin,
Markus Wicki,
Andreas Dworak Ruflin,
Marie Agnès Schäfer-Altiparmakian
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.12.2008
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.7.043.585-2
UID/VAT
CHE-114.634.795
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung hat insbesondere zum Zweck, Kinder vor Gefährdung, Vernachlässigung, Ausbeutung und vor jeglicher Gewalt zu schützen. Sie hat das Ziel, die seelische, psychische, körperliche und sexuelle Integrität und die Würde der Kinder zu wahren, ihre Rechte durchzusetzen, ihre individuelle Entfaltung und ihre soziale Integration zu fördern. Die Stiftung orientiert sich bei ihrer Tätigkeit an anerkannten rechtlichen und wissenschaftlichen Grundlagen. Die Stiftung hat gemeinnützigen Charakter.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Balmer-Etienne AG | Luzern | 10.09.2021 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Bern | 27.06.2014 | 09.09.2021 | |
T + R AG | Muri bei Bern | 19.12.2008 | 26.06.2014 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Protezione dell'infanzia Svizzera
- Protection de l'enfance Suisse
- Stiftung Kinderschutz Schweiz
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
29.01.2024 | active | 09312/2023 | |
clickandstop.ch | - | deleted | 08905/2022 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Kinderschutz Schweiz
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006132108, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Kinderschutz Schweiz, in Bern, CHE-114.634.795, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 203 vom 19.10.2023, Publ. 1005864254).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Meier, Alexander, von Frauenfeld, in Niederönz, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Eastus, Samuel, von Nidau, in Niederwangen b. Bern (Köniz), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005864254, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Kinderschutz Schweiz, in Bern, CHE-114.634.795, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 156 vom 15.08.2022, Publ. 1005540771).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Engel, Cindy, von Thierachern, in Kirchdorf BE, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005540771, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Kinderschutz Schweiz, in Bern, CHE-114.634.795, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 176 vom 10.09.2021, Publ. 1005288570).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Riva Gapany, Paola Ida, von Lugano, in Sion, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wider, Diana Prof., von Widnau, in Büron, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Reichlin, Beat, von Luzern, in Langnau am Albis, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wicki, Markus, von Aristau, in Stallikon, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.