Reports for Kinderdörfli St. Iddaheim
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Kinderdörfli St. Iddaheim
- Kinderdörfli St. Iddaheim in Lütisburg Station is an Association from the sector «Operation of other homes (excluding holiday homes)». Kinderdörfli St. Iddaheim is active.
- The management has 9 active persons registered.
- The last commercial register change was made on 06.10.2021. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- In the commercial register the organization Kinderdörfli St. Iddaheim is registered under the UID CHE-112.374.732.
Management (9)
newest members of the committee
Hanspeter Helbling,
Glen Aggeler,
Andrea Schneider,
Beda Zünd,
Esther Burkhalter
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.05.2005
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Lütisburg
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.6.057.367-3
UID/VAT
CHE-112.374.732
Sector
Operation of other homes (excluding holiday homes)
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Schulung, Bildung, Erziehung und Betreuung von verhaltensauffälligen, milieugeschädigten und lernbehinderten Kindern und Jugendlichen durch Führung des Heims 'Kinderdörfli St. Iddaheim' in Lütisburg. Mittel: Pensionsbeiträge, Schulgelder, Erträge aus den Betrieben und Vermögenswerten, Beiträge und Subventionen von Bund, Kantonen und weiteren öffentlich-rechtlichen Körperschaften, Schenkungen, Vergabungen und Spenden.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Kinderdörfli St. Iddaheim
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005306339, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Kinderdörfli St. Iddaheim, in Lütisburg, CHE-112.374.732, Verein (SHAB Nr. 207 vom 23.10.2020, Publ. 1005007033).
Organisation neu:
[gestrichen aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Scherrer, Zita, von Bütschwil, in Bütschwil, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Helbling, Hanspeter, von Rapperswil-Jona, in Bütschwil (Bütschwil-Ganterschwil), Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005007033, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Kinderdörfli St. Iddaheim, in Lütisburg, CHE-112.374.732, Verein (SHAB Nr. 247 vom 20.12.2016, S.0, Publ. 3234111).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Müller, Franz, von Waldkirch, in Waldkirch, Präsident des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schönenberger, Alfons, von Kirchberg SG, in Kirchberg SG, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Aggeler, Glen, von Mels, in Herisau, Präsident des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3234111, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Kinderdörfli St. Iddaheim, in Lütisburg, CHE-112.374.732, Verein (SHAB Nr. 212 vom 02.11.2015, Publ. 2457255).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hengartner Thurnheer, Simone, von Waldkirch, in Schwarzenbach SG (Jonschwil), Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Stadler-Egli, Margrit, von Kirchberg SG und Bronschhofen (Wil SG), in Bazenheid (Kirchberg SG), Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schneider, Andrea, von Uzwil, in Niederuzwil (Oberuzwil), Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.