Reports for Killias Chur GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Killias Chur GmbH
- Killias Chur GmbH has its legal headquarters in Chur and is active. It operates in the sector «Trading in household appliances and related goods».
- The management consists of 2 persons. The company was founded on 06.07.2000.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 04.02.2019. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- In the commercial register the company Killias Chur GmbH is registered under the UID CHE-105.590.087.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.07.2000
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Chur
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.4.000.837-9
UID/VAT
CHE-105.590.087
Sector
Trading in household appliances and related goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit Kristall-, Glas- und Porzellanwaren sowie Artikeln aller Art des Haushalt-, Hotel- und Restaurantbedarfes; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Killias Chur GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004557729, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Killias Chur GmbH, in Chur, CHE-105.590.087, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 8 vom 14.01.2019, Publ. 1004540534).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Killias, Hans, von Chur, in Chur, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 11 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00];
Lessing Killias, Kerstin, von Chur, in Chur, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 9 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Publication number: HR02-1004540534, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Killias Chur GmbH, in Chur, CHE-105.590.087, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 54 vom 19.03.2018, Publ. 4120131).
Statutenänderung:
17.12.2018.
Zweck neu:
Handel mit Kristall-, Glas- und Porzellanwaren sowie Artikeln aller Art des Haushalt-, Hotel- und Restaurantbedarfes;
vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten. Nebenleistungspflichten, Vorhand-, Vorkaufs- oder Kaufsrechte gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten.
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen der Geschäftsführung an die Gesellschafter erfolgen schriftlich oder per E-Mail.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Killias-Pogorelz, Maria, von Chur, in Chur, Gesellschafterin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 16'000.00;
Piga-Killias, Bettina, von Chur, in Blonay, Gesellschafterin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 2'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Killias, Hans, von Chur, in Chur, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 2'000.00].
Publication number: 4120131, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Killias Chur GmbH, in Chur, CHE-105.590.087, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 31 vom 16.02.2009, Publ. 4882214).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Killias, Hans, von Chur, in Chur, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 2'000.00 [bisher: in Davos, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Killias-Pogorelz, Maria, von Chur, in Chur, Gesellschafterin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 16'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.