Reports for Kieswerk Arch AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Kieswerk Arch AG
- Kieswerk Arch AG is currently active and the industry «Mining of stones and earth». The legal headquarters are in Arch.
- The management consists of 5 persons. The company was founded on 10.05.1994.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 27.09.2023. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company Kieswerk Arch AG is registered under the UID CHE-107.865.556.
Management (5)
newest board members
Marcel Flury,
Ivan Schmid,
Bruno Kiefer,
Gregor Martin Schwab,
Ronald Neher
newest authorized signatories
Marcel Flury,
Ivan Schmid,
Bruno Kiefer,
Gregor Martin Schwab,
Ronald Neher
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.05.1994
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Arch
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-073.3.005.263-9
UID/VAT
CHE-107.865.556
Sector
Mining of stones and earth
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb eines Kies- und Betonwerkes, Abbau von Kies und Sand, Auffüllungen, Rekultivierungen und Recycling sowie Handel mit allen damit zusammenhängenden Produkten. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke erwerben und veräussern, sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, gleichartige Unternehmungen erwerben und sämtliche Geschäfte tätigen, die mit dem Gesellschaftszweck zusammenhängen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Burgdorf | <2004 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Kieswerk Arch AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005846537, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Kieswerk Arch AG, in Arch, CHE-107.865.556, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 85 vom 03.05.2018, Publ. 4209449).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schlup, Alfred, von Arch, in Arch, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Eggimann, Barbara, von Arch, in Arch, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Flury, Marcel, von Hägendorf, in Arch, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Neher, Ronald, von Fällanden, in Burgdorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Schmid, Ivan, von Hergiswil bei Willisau, in Arch, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schwab, Gregor Martin, von Arch, in Arch, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 4209449, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Kieswerk Arch AG, in Arch, CHE-107.865.556, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 175 vom 11.09.2014, Publ. 1709537).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gutknecht, Martin, von Ried bei Kerzers, in Solothurn, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Röthlisberger, Christian, von Langnau im Emmental, in Arch, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kiefer, Bruno, von Starrkirch-Wil, in Belp, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Eggimann, Barbara, von Arch, in Arch, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 1709537, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Kieswerk Arch AG, in Arch, CHE-107.865.556, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 182 vom 19.09.2012, Publ. 6855208).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
BDO AG (CHE-414.946.954)[CH-053.9.006.375-4], in Burgdorf, Revisionsstelle [bisher: BDO AG (CH-053.9.006.375-4)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.