Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Branches (1)
Reports for Kieser Training Schweiz AG
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.08.1997
Deletion from the commercial register
29.06.2020
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-270.3.011.871-0
UID/VAT
CHE-108.662.139
Sector
Sport services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Erbringen von Dienstleistungen im Gesundheitssektor in der Schweiz, insbesondere das Betreiben von Trainingscentern in der Schweiz. Die Gesellschaft kann alle kaufmännischen und finanziellen Geschäfte tätigen, welche direkt oder indirekt mit dem vorerwähnten Gesellschaftszweck zusammenhängen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (4)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
OBT AG | Zürich | 10.01.2018 | 28.06.2020 | |
KPMG AG | Zürich | 03.07.2015 | 09.01.2018 | |
srag AG, Zweigniederlassung Basel | Basel | 13.02.2007 | 26.06.2012 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- MTC Medical Teaching Concept AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
17.11.2009 | active | 57186/2009 | |
17.11.2009 | active | 57187/2009 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Kieser Training Schweiz AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR03-1004922414, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Kieser Training Schweiz AG, in Zürich, CHE-108.662.139, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 92 vom 13.05.2020, Publ. 1004888316). Aktiven und Passiven (Fremdkapital) gehen infolge Fusion auf die Kieser Training AG, in Zürich (CHE-107.834.656), über. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1004888316, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Kieser Training Schweiz AG, in Zürich, CHE-108.662.139, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 73 vom 15.04.2019, Publ. 1004610276).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ferrari, Sandro, von Zürich, in Birmensdorf (ZH), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Antonopoulos, Michael Charalambos, von Wettingen, in Weiningen (ZH), Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Oetwil an der Limmat];
Mangold, Beatrice, von Emmen, in Regensdorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Meier, Patrik, von Waltenschwil, in Neuheim, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Sins].
Publication number: HR02-1004610276, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Kieser Training Schweiz AG, in Zürich, CHE-108.662.139, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 6 vom 10.01.2018, Publ. 3978589).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Haasters, Marcel, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Geroldswil, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schuster, Thorsten, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Voerde (Niederrhein) (DE), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.