Reports for KETTLER Alu-Rad Suisse AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout KETTLER Alu-Rad Suisse AG
- KETTLER Alu-Rad Suisse AG from Buochs operates in the sector «Trading in consumer goods» and is active.
- The management of the company KETTLER Alu-Rad Suisse AG, which was founded on the 28.08.2017, consists of 4 persons.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 10.08.2023. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company KETTLER Alu-Rad Suisse AG is registered under the UID CHE-236.231.911.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Marco Schär,
Egbert Karl Hageböck,
Stefan Schär-Henauer,
Georg Clemens Honkomp
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.08.2017
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Buochs
Commercial Registry Office
NW
Commercial register number
CH-217.3.564.654-6
UID/VAT
CHE-236.231.911
Sector
Trading in consumer goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Gross- und Einzelhandel, Import und Export mit und von Zweirädern, Zweiradteilen und -zubehör, Sportbekleidung und Sportartikel aller Art (Nebenzweck gemäss Statuten).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: KETTLER Alu-Rad Suisse AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005813748, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
KETTLER Alu-Rad Suisse AG, in Buochs, CHE-236.231.911, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 129 vom 08.07.2019, Publ. 1004669992).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schär, Marco, von Hallau, in Buochs, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004669992, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
KETTLER Alu-Rad Suisse AG, bisher in Mont-Vully, CHE-236.231.911, Aktiengesellschaft (vom 31.08.2017, Publ. 3725455).
Statutenänderung:
01.07.2019.
Sitz neu:
Buochs.
Domizil neu:
Vorder Obgasse 1a, 6374 Buochs.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Katscher, Peter, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Heinsberg (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Bronst, Olaf Joachim Rudolf, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Mont-Vully, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hageböck, Egbert Karl, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Pulheim (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Schär, Stefan, von Hallau, in Buochs, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004670119, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
KETTLER Alu-Rad Suisse AG, in Mont-Vully, CHE-236.231.911 (FOSC du 31.08.2017, p. 0/3725455). Die Rechtseinheit wird infolge Sitzverlegung nach Buochs im Handelsregister des Kantons Freiburg von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.