Address
Prättigauerstrasse 32
7265 Davos Wolfgang
Reports for Kessler AG Davos-Wolfgang
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Kessler AG Davos-Wolfgang
- Kessler AG Davos-Wolfgang has its legal headquarters in Davos Wolfgang and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The management of the company Kessler AG Davos-Wolfgang consists of 5 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 21.07.1960.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 22.11.2023. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company's UID is CHE-106.018.944.
Management (5)
newest board members
Nino Kessler-Berry,
Michael Kessler,
Philipp Kessler,
Rolf Kessler-Stiffler,
Thomas Rochat-Brägger
newest authorized signatories
Nino Kessler-Berry,
Michael Kessler,
Philipp Kessler,
Rolf Kessler-Stiffler,
Thomas Rochat-Brägger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.07.1960
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Davos
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.3.002.111-2
UID/VAT
CHE-106.018.944
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb von Tankstellen mit Kiosk und Shops; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhand Center AG | Chur | 22.11.2023 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
D+M Treuhand und Beratung GmbH | Chur | 03.11.2006 | 21.11.2023 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Kessler AG Davos-Wolfgang
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005891214, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Kessler AG Davos-Wolfgang, in Davos, CHE-106.018.944, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 230 vom 27.11.2019, Publ. 1004769213).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
D+M Treuhand und Beratung GmbH (CHE-110.198.660), in Chur, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Treuhand Center AG (CHE-112.589.528), in Chur, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004769213, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Kessler AG Davos-Wolfgang, in Davos, CHE-106.018.944, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 13 vom 19.01.2017, Publ. 3293903).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kessler-Huber, Heinz, von Davos und Schiers, in Davos Wolfgang, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kessler, Nino, von Davos, in Davos, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 3293903, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Kessler AG Davos-Wolfgang, in Davos, CHE-106.018.944, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 226 vom 21.11.2013, Publ. 1193493).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kessler-Rösselet, Wolfgang, von Davos und Schiers, in Davos, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rochat-Kessler, Jean-Pierre, von L'Abbaye, in Davos, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kessler, Michael, von Davos, in Zürich, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kessler, Nino, von Davos, in Davos, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kessler, Philipp, von Davos, in Birsfelden, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kessler, Rolf, von Davos, in Davos, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rochat, Thomas, von L'Abbaye, in Davos, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.