Reports for KECO Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout KECO Holding AG
- KECO Holding AG is active in the industry «Operation of investment companies» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Herisau.
- The management consists of 3 persons. The company was founded on 13.06.1995.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 03.04.2019. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register AR under the UID CHE-108.309.269.
- Next to the company KECO Holding AG there are 2 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Hölzli Immo AG, Kern Concept AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.06.1995
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Herisau
Commercial Registry Office
AR
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.038.952-6
UID/VAT
CHE-108.309.269
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, das Halten und die Verwaltung von in- und ausländischen Beteiligungen. Die Gesellschaft ist berechtigt, Finanzierungsgeschäfte zu tätigen sowie Immaterialgüterrechte zu erwerben, zu verwalten und zu veräussern. Zudem kann sie Grundstücke erwerben, verkaufen und belasten sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, welche geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
OBT AG | St. Gallen | <2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Kern Concept AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: KECO Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004602140, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
KECO Holding AG, in Herisau, CHE-108.309.269, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 172 vom 06.09.2017, Publ. 3736671).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schneeberger, Edgar, von Madiswil, in Rorschach, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: 3736671, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
KECO Holding AG, in Herisau, CHE-108.309.269, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 126 vom 01.07.2016, Publ. 2926411).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Frei, Tobias, von Widnau, in Au (SG), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: 2926411, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
Kern Concept AG, in Herisau, CHE-108.309.269, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 147 vom 31.07.2012, Publ. 6791464).
Statutenänderung:
28.06.2016.
Firma neu:
KECO Holding AG.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, das Halten und die Verwaltung von in- und ausländischen Beteiligungen. Die Gesellschaft ist berechtigt, Finanzierungsgeschäfte zu tätigen sowie Immaterialgüterrechte zu erwerben, zu verwalten und zu veräussern. Zudem kann sie Grundstücke erwerben, verkaufen und belasten sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, welche geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände neu:
Die Bestimmung über die Sacheinlage bei der Gründung vom 12.06.1995 ist aus den Statuten gestrichen worden.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Namenaktionäre erfolgen schriftlich oder per E-Mail an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kern, Peter, von Lutzenberg, in Teufen (AR), Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident und Delegierter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Fässler, Urs, von Appenzell, in Herisau, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Frei, Tobias, von Widnau, in Au (SG), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Trappmaier, Sabine, von Corcelles-près-Payerne, in St. Gallen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Schneeberger, Edgar, von Madiswil, in Rorschach, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident und Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.