Reports for Kaspar Giovanelli AG Architekturbüro
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Kaspar Giovanelli AG Architekturbüro
- Kaspar Giovanelli AG Architekturbüro has its legal headquarters in Bern and is active. It operates in the sector «Architectural and engineering activities».
- Kaspar Giovanelli AG Architekturbüro has 2 persons entered in its management.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 27.06.2023. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company Kaspar Giovanelli AG Architekturbüro is registered under the UID CHE-108.156.304.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.02.1991
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.3.006.117-4
UID/VAT
CHE-108.156.304
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb eines Architekturbüros, insbesondere die Planung und Realisierung von Bauten aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen oder Zweigbüros in der Schweiz und im Ausland errichten, sich an andern Unternehmen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben oder veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fabers AG in Liquidation | Thun | 19.12.1996 | 07.03.2012 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Kaspar Giovanelli AG Architekturbüro
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005778826, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Kaspar Giovanelli AG Architekturbüro, in Bern, CHE-108.156.304, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 1 vom 03.01.2023, Publ. 1005643006).
Fusion:
Übernahme der Aktiven und Passiven der Immobilien Gilbach AG, in Bern (CHE-102.560.322), gemäss Fusionsvertrag vom 20.06.2023 und Bilanz per 31.12.2022. Aktiven von CHF 110'269.10 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 4'390.00 gehen auf die übernehmende Gesellschaft über. Da die übernehmende Gesellschaft sämtliche Aktien der übertragenden Gesellschaft hält, findet weder eine Kapitalerhöhung noch eine Aktienzuteilung statt.
Publication number: HR02-1005643006, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Kaspar Giovanelli AG Architekturbüro, in Frutigen, CHE-108.156.304, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 75 vom 19.04.2022, Publ. 1005452540).
Statutenänderung:
21.12.2022.
Sitz neu:
Bern.
Domizil neu:
Laubeggstrasse 47, 3006 Bern.
Publication number: HR02-1005452540, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Kaspar Giovanelli AG Architekturbüro, in Frutigen, CHE-108.156.304, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 206 vom 22.10.2021, Publ. 1005318066).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Giovanelli, Kaspar Wilhelm, von Frutigen, in Frutigen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Giovanelli, Reto Mario, von Frutigen, in Bern, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien];
Giovanelli Lüthi, Daniela Rebekka, von Frutigen, in Hondrich (Spiez), Delegierte des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.