Reports for Kartoffelzentrale Amt Burgdorf Genossenschaft
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Kartoffelzentrale Amt Burgdorf Genossenschaft
- Kartoffelzentrale Amt Burgdorf Genossenschaft has its legal headquarters in Alchenflüh and is active. It operates in the sector «Trading in food products».
- The organization was founded on 17.12.1956 and has 7 persons in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 02.04.2019.
- The organization's UID is CHE-107.182.061.
Management (7)
newest members of the administration
Michael Schneider,
Andreas Kunz,
Mathias Kummer,
Samuel Isch,
Fritz Kunz-Gurtner
newest authorized signatories
Michael Schneider,
Fritz Kunz-Gurtner,
Werner Nadenbousch,
Heinz Lüthi
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.12.1956
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Rüdtligen-Alchenflüh
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.5.006.404-1
UID/VAT
CHE-107.182.061
Sector
Trading in food products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Genossenschaft bezweckt die Verwertung von landwirtschaftlichen Produkten, insbesondere Kartoffeln, und vertritt die Interessen der Produzenten gegenüber dem Handel. Sie fördert die Qualitätsproduktion. Die Genossenschaft kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen mit gleichem oder ähnlichem Zweck im In- und Ausland beteiligen oder solche Unternehmungen übernehmen, Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten oder veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte durchführen, die mit dem Genossenschaftszweck direkt oder indrekt in Zusammenhang stehen oder ihn zu fördern geeignet sind. Die Genossenschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Unico Treuhand AG | Burgdorf | 21.06.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Kartoffelzentrale Amt Burgdorf
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Kartoffelzentrale Amt Burgdorf Genossenschaft
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004600732, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 36 vom 21.02.2001, publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 361 vom 15.02.2001 Kartoffelzentrale Amt Burgdorf Genossenschaft, in Rüdtligen-Alchenflüh, CHE-107.182.061, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 53 vom 18.03.2019, Publ. 1004589474).
Domizil neu:
Jurastrasse 12, 3422 Alchenflüh.
Publication number: HR02-1004589474, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Kartoffelzentrale Amt Burgdorf Genossenschaft, in Rüdtligen-Alchenflüh, CHE-107.182.061, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 138 vom 21.07.2015, S.0, Publ. 2281463).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
von Ballmoos, Samuel, von Heimiswil, in Lyssach, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schär, Hans, von Zauggenried, in Zauggenried, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Hauert, Werner, von Ersigen, in Ersigen, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schneider, Michael, von Lyssach, in Mattstetten, Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Lüthi, Heinz, von Rüderswil, in Ersigen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Nadenbousch, Werner, von Val-de-Ruz, in Hettiswil b. Hindelbank (Krauchthal), Mitglied der Verwaltung, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Isch, Samuel, von Fraubrunnen, in Etzelkofen (Fraubrunnen), Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Kummer, Mathias, von Fraubrunnen, in Limpach (Fraubrunnen), Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Kunz, Andreas, von Ersigen, in Ersigen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 2281463, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Kartoffelzentrale Amt Burgdorf Genossenschaft, in Rüdtligen-Alchenflüh, CHE-107.182.061, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 36 vom 21.02.2013, Publ. 7074328).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Unico Treuhand AG (CHE-106.486.498), in Burgdorf, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Unico Treuhand AG (CH-053.3.000.945-7)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.