Address
c/o Hans Rudolf Triebold
Ober-Kuonimattweg 74
6010 Kriens
Reports for Karl Paul Lütolf-Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Karl Paul Lütolf-Stiftung
- Karl Paul Lütolf-Stiftung is active in the industry «Religious, political or secular associations» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Kriens.
- There are 6 active persons registered in the management.
- The organization has last modified its commercial register entry on 31.08.2023. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-113.303.083.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Thomas Scherrer,
Michael Werner Johannes Zeier-Rast,
Urban Henzirohs,
Hans Rudolf Triebold,
Irene Schwander
newest authorized signatories
Thomas Scherrer,
Michael Werner Johannes Zeier-Rast,
Urban Henzirohs,
Hans Rudolf Triebold,
Irene Schwander
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.01.1994
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Kriens
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.7.015.919-9
UID/VAT
CHE-113.303.083
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Religiöse und charakterliche Förderung und Ausbildung von Führerinnen und Führern des Pfadfinderkorps Luzernerleu, in Luzern; die Zuwendungen sollen im besonderen sozial schwächeren Führerinnen und Führern Ausbildungs- und Förderungskurse ermöglichen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Lütolf Karl Paul-Stiftung
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Karl Paul Lütolf-Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005827551, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Karl Paul Lütolf-Stiftung, in Kriens, CHE-113.303.083, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 182 vom 18.09.2020, Publ. 1004981298).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Scherrer, Thomas, von Luzern, in Luzern, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Zeier-Rast, Michael, von Luzern, in Luzern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1004981298, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Karl Paul Lütolf-Stiftung, in Kriens, CHE-113.303.083, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 210 vom 30.10.2017, Publ. 3838023).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bachmann, Peter, von Luzern und Aristau, in Luzern, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Henzirohs, Urban, von Luzern, in Luzern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3838023, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Karl Paul Lütolf-Stiftung, in Kriens, CHE-113.303.083, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 209 vom 28.10.2015, Publ. 2449897).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kreienbühl, Hans Rudolf, von Luzern, in Luzern, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.