Reports for Kanzlei AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Kanzlei AG
- Kanzlei AG with its legal headquarters in Kriens is active. Kanzlei AG operates in the sector «Notary and advocate office».
- The company was founded on 23.03.1965 and has 4 persons in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 10.03.2023.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-107.243.490.
Management (4)
newest board members
lic. iur. Marius Joseph Brem,
lic. iur. Monika Lütolf-Geiser,
lic. iur. Urs Daniel Lütolf,
Peter Christoph Germann
newest authorized signatories
lic. iur. Marius Joseph Brem,
lic. iur. Monika Lütolf-Geiser,
lic. iur. Urs Daniel Lütolf,
Peter Christoph Germann
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.03.1965
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Kriens
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.007.272-2
UID/VAT
CHE-107.243.490
Sector
Notary and advocate office
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Erbringen von Rechtsdienstleistungen im In- und Ausland durch in der Schweiz registrierte Anwältinnen und Anwälte und damit verbundene Tätigkeiten sowie das Erbringen von Notariatsdienstleistungen in den Kantonen, in denen dies zulässig ist. Die Gesellschaft kann alle kommerziellen und finanziellen Geschäftstätigkeiten durchführen, die ihrem Zweck dienen. Sie kann auch Zweigniederlassungen errichten und Grundeigentum erwerben.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Landolt Steuer- und Unternehmensberatung | Hergiswil (NW) | <2004 | 19.08.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Kanzlei AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005697472, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Kanzlei AG, in Kriens, CHE-107.243.490, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 107 vom 05.06.2014, S.0, Publ. 1539615).
Statutenänderung:
02.03.2023.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Erbringen von Rechtsdienstleistungen im In- und Ausland durch in der Schweiz registrierte Anwältinnen und Anwälte und damit verbundene Tätigkeiten sowie das Erbringen von Notariatsdienstleistungen in den Kantonen, in denen dies zulässig ist. Die Gesellschaft kann alle kommerziellen und finanziellen Geschäftstätigkeiten durchführen, die ihrem Zweck dienen. Sie kann auch Zweigniederlassungen errichten und Grundeigentum erwerben.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen erfolgen per E-Mail oder brieflich. [Weitere Änderungen berühren keine publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen.]
Publication number: 1539615, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Kanzlei AG, in Kriens, CHE-107.243.490, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 23 vom 04.02.2014, Publ. 1324459).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Keller, Dr. iur. Franz, von Nottwil, in Kriens, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brem, lic. iur. Marius, von Rudolfstetten-Friedlisberg, in Luzern, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 1324459, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Kanzlei AG, in Kriens, CHE-107.243.490, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 160 vom 20.08.2008, S. 10, Publ. 4619438).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Steiger, lic. iur. Dieter, von Luzern, in Luzern, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.