Address
c/o Martin Stöckli
Hinderhus 1
6106 Werthenstein
Reports for Käsereigenossenschaft Kleinstein
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Käsereigenossenschaft Kleinstein
- Käsereigenossenschaft Kleinstein is a Cooperative with its legal headquarters in Werthenstein. Käsereigenossenschaft Kleinstein belongs to the industry «Production of comestibles» and is currently active.
- Käsereigenossenschaft Kleinstein has 3 persons entered in its management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 27.07.2023.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register LU under the UID CHE-102.419.758.
Management (3)
newest members of the administration
Martin Krummenacher,
Florian Franz Röösli,
Martin Franz Stöckli
newest authorized signatories
Martin Krummenacher,
Florian Franz Röösli,
Martin Franz Stöckli
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.01.1916
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Werthenstein
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.5.007.308-9
UID/VAT
CHE-102.419.758
Sector
Production of comestibles
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Wahrung und Förderung der milchwirtschaftlichen Interessen ihrer Mitglieder durch gemeinsame Selbsthilfe.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Käsereigenossenschaft Kleinstein
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005805133, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Käsereigenossenschaft Kleinstein, in Werthenstein, CHE-102.419.758, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 179 vom 15.09.2017, Publ. 3754237).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Marbacher, Franz, von Werthenstein und Romoos, in Werthenstein, Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten;
von Burg, Martin Peter, von Luzern und Wagenhausen, in Werthenstein, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Krummenacher, Martin, von Werthenstein und Entlebuch, in Werthenstein, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten;
Röösli, Florian Franz, von Werthenstein, in Werthenstein, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten.
Publication number: 3754237, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Käsereigenossenschaft Kleinstein, in Werthenstein, CHE-102.419.758, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 73 vom 15.04.2016, Publ. 2781183).
Domizil neu:
c/o Martin Stöckli, Hinderhus 1, 6106 Werthenstein.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wirz, Franz, von Werthenstein und Hergiswil bei Willisau, in Werthenstein, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stöckli, Martin Franz, von Werthenstein, in Werthenstein, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2781183, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Käsereigenossenschaft Kleinstein, in Werthenstein, CHE-102.419.758, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 124 vom 01.07.2009, Publ. 5104016).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stadelmann, Josef, von Escholzmatt und Werthenstein, in Werthenstein, Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
von Burg, Martin Peter, von Luzern und Wagenhausen, in Werthenstein, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.