Reports for Jutzler AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Jutzler AG
- Jutzler AG from Oberburg operates in the sector «Furniture manufacturing» and is active.
- There are 7 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 18.08.2021.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-101.703.317.
Management (7)
newest board members
Andreas Müller,
Peter Brand,
Philipp Kuhn,
Walter Linder,
Karim Alexandre Koubâa-Olesen
newest authorized signatories
Andreas Müller,
Peter Brand,
Philipp Kuhn,
Walter Linder,
Karim Alexandre Koubâa-Olesen
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.02.1967
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Burgdorf
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.3.004.874-4
UID/VAT
CHE-101.703.317
Sector
Furniture manufacturing
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Fabrikation von und Handel mit Möbeln. Die Gesellschaft kann landwirtschaftlich nutzbare Liegenschaften oder landwirtschaftliche Gewerbe erwerben und veräussern, pachten oder verpachten und landwirtschaftliche Gewerbe oder einzelne landwirtschaftliche Grundstücke selbst bewirtschaften sowie Liegenschaften erwerben und veräussern. Ein allfälliger Nebenzweck ist aus den Statuten ersichtlich.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Bern | <2004 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
JUTZLER | 15.06.1988 | active | 02911/1988 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Jutzler AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005272931, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Jutzler AG, in Burgdorf, CHE-101.703.317, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 136 vom 15.07.2016, Publ. 2955349).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Jutzler, Dieter, von Basel, in Oberburg, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Jutzler, Martin, von Basel, in Heimiswil, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2955349, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Jutzler AG, in Burgdorf, CHE-101.703.317, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 125 vom 02.07.2014, Publ. 1587925).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Linder-Jutzler, Andrea, von Basel, in Heimiswil, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Koubâa, Karim-Alexandre, von Basel, in Walperswil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Koubâa, Karim, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Brand, Peter, von Trachselwald, in Münchenbuchsee, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kuhn, Philipp, von Trub, in Heimiswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien];
Linder, Walter, von Linden, in Heimiswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien];
Müller, Andreas, von Freienbach, in Wynigen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien].
Publication number: 1587925, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Jutzler AG, in Burgdorf, CHE-101.703.317, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 143 vom 26.07.2013, Publ. 1001265).
Statutenänderung:
24.06.2014. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG (CHE-308.775.052), in Bern, Revisionsstelle [bisher: PricewaterhouseCoopers AG].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.