Address
c/o CBM Natural Stones, Keyhan Manavi
Rue du Liseron 7
1006 Lausanne
Reports for Juma Consulting Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Juma Consulting Sàrl
- Juma Consulting Sàrl in Lausanne is a Limited liability company from the sector «Services regarding management consulting». Juma Consulting Sàrl is active.
- The management has 3 active persons registered.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 25.08.2023.
- The company Juma Consulting Sàrl is registered under the UID CHE-110.028.489.
- Companies with the same address as Juma Consulting Sàrl: Bi2B Sàrl, CBM Natural Stones, Keyhan Manavi, Formasuisse SA.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.04.2003
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Lausanne
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.034.071-6
UID/VAT
CHE-110.028.489
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but tous conseils juridiques et économiques, ainsi que la restructuration d'entreprises, le négoce de tous produits, toutes activités d'entreprise générale dans le domaine de la construction, notamment l'acquisition, la rénovation et la vente de biens immobiliers (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Other company names
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Juma Consulting Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005824169, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Juma Consulting Sàrl, à Ecublens (VD), CHE-110.028.489 (FOSC du 08.09.2017, p. 0/3742333). Statuts modifiés le 15.06.2023. Siège transféré à Lausanne.
Nouvelle adresse:
Rue du Liseron 7, c/o CBM Natural Stones, Keyhan Manavi, 1006 Lausanne.
Nouvelles communications aux associés:
par écrit ou par courriel. Manavi Keyhan n'est plus président. Jusufi Rrustem n'est plus gérant;
sa signature est radiée.
Publication number: 3742333, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Juma Consulting Sàrl, à Lausanne, CHE-110.028.489 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834). Statuts modifiés le 22 août 2017. Siège transféré à Ecublens (VD).
Nouvelle adresse:
route de Vallaire 149, 1024 Ecublens VD.
Publication number: 5837046, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
FSC Sàrl, à Pully, CH-550-1034071-6, conseils financiers et dans le domaine des affaires en général (FOSC du 25.04.2003, p. 10/964538). Statuts modifiés le 15 septembre 2010.
Nouvelle raison de commerce:
Juma Consulting Sàrl. Siège transféré à Lausanne.
Nouvelle adresse:
avenue du Grammont 14, 1007 Lausanne.
Nouveau but:
la société a pour but tous conseils juridiques et économiques, ainsi que la restructuration d'entreprises, le négoce de tous produits, toutes activités d'entreprise générale dans le domaine de la construction, notamment l'acquisition, la rénovation et la vente de biens immobiliers (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Obligation de fournir des prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption:
pour les détails, voir les statuts.
Communications aux associés:
par courrier écrit, par télécopie ou par courriel. Seiler Félix, qui n'est plus associé-gérant et dont la signature est radiée, cèdent sa part de CHF 19'000 par CHF 9'600 à Jusufi Rrustem, de Sâles, à Lausanne, et par CHF 9'400 à Manavi Keyhan, de et à Lausanne, nouveaux associés-gérants avec signature individuelle. Seiler Silvia, qui n'est plus associée-gérante et dont la signature est radiée, cède sa part de CHF 1'000 à Bechaalany Joseph, de Lausanne, à Peyres-Possens, nouvel associé sans signature. Le capital social de CHF 20'000 a été libéré ultérieurement à concurrence d'un montant de CHF 10'000 et est divisé en 200 parts de CHF 100. Manavi Keyhan, élu président des gérants, est désormais titulaire de 94 parts de CHF 100, Jusufi Rrustem, de 96 parts de CHF 100, et Bechaalany Joseph de 10 parts de CHF 100. Selon déclaration des gérants du 15 septembre 2010, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.