Reports for Joseph Haefeli SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Joseph Haefeli SA
- Joseph Haefeli SA is active in the industry «Other building work (incl. Interior finishing)» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Le Noirmont.
- There is one active person registered in the management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 23.10.2008, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-107.978.835.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.02.1999
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Le Noirmont
Commercial Registry Office
JU
Commercial register number
CH-674.3.000.605-1
UID/VAT
CHE-107.978.835
Sector
Other building work (incl. Interior finishing)
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Agencement de cuisines et vente d'appareils ménagers
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Leitenberg & Associés SA | La Chaux-de-Fonds | <2004 | 22.10.2008 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Haefeli Joseph SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Joseph Haefeli SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 4702694, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Joseph Haefeli SA, à Le Noirmont, CH-674.3.000.605-1, Société anonyme (FOSC no 51 du 15.03.1999, p. 1705).
Modification des statuts:
15.10.2008.
Nouvelle adresse:
Rauracie 10, 2340 Le Noirmont.
Nouvelle restriction à la transmissibilité des actions nominatives:
selon statuts. Selon déclaration du conseil d'administration du 15.10.2008, la société n'est pas soumise à un contrôle ordinaire et renonce à un contrôle restreint.
Personnes et signatures radiées:
Haefeli, Joseph, de Mümliswil-Ramiswil, à Le Noirmont, président, avec signature individuelle;
Haefeli, Heidi, de Mümliswil-Ramiswil, à Le Noirmont, directrice, avec signature individuelle;
Haefeli, Marie-Pierre, de Mümliswil-Ramiswil, à Saignelégier, directrice, avec signature individuelle;
Fiduciaire Lucien Leitenberg SA, à La Chaux-de-Fonds, organe de révision.
Inscription ou modification de personnes:
Haefeli, Claude, de Mümliswil-Ramiswil, à Le Noirmont, administrateur unique, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: à Saignelégier, vice-président].
Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Joseph Haefeli SA, à L e N o i r m o n t, société anonyme (nouvelle inscription).
Date des statuts:
25.02.1999.
But:
agencement de cuisines et vente d'appareils ménagers.
Capital-actions:
CHF 200 000, entièrement libéré.
Actions:
200 actions nominatives de CHF 1000 chacune.
Faits qualifiés:
apports en nature: actifs et passifs de la raison individuelle Joseph Haefeli, à savoir des actifs de CHF 1 197 178.35 et des passifs de CHF 724 236, soit une valeur nette de CHF 472 942.35, acceptée pour ce prix.
dont CHF 200 000 imputés sur le capital- actions Organe de publication:
FOSC. Communication par lettre recommandée. Restriction de la transmissibilité des actions.
Personnes inscrites:
Haefeli, Joseph, de Mümliswil-Ramiswil, à Le Noirmont, président, avec signature individuelle;
Haefeli, Claude, de Mümliswil-Ramiswil, à Saignelégier, vice- président, avec signature individuelle;
Haefeli, Heidi, de Mümliswil-Ramiswil, à Le Noirmont, directrice, avec signature individuelle;
Haefeli, Marie-Pierre, de Mümliswil-Ramiswil, à Saignelégier, directrice, avec signature individuelle;
Fiduciaire Lucien Leitenberg SA, à La Chaux-de-Fonds, organe de révision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.