Reports for Jolly Jump GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Jolly Jump GmbH
- Jolly Jump GmbH is active in the industry «Other services: entertainment and recreation» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Volketswil.
- The management of the company Jolly Jump GmbH consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 24.04.2002.
- On the 21.09.2021 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- In the commercial register the company Jolly Jump GmbH is registered under the UID CHE-109.561.854.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.04.2002
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Volketswil
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.025.024-1
UID/VAT
CHE-109.561.854
Sector
Other services: entertainment and recreation
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb von Unterhaltungsanlagen und Einrichtungen des Schaustellergeschäftes zum Hauptzweck. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an andere Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, Vertretungen übernehmen sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sein können, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnungen vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen. Sie kann Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Jolly Jump GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005295236, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Jolly Jump GmbH, in Uster, CHE-109.561.854, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 184 vom 24.09.2018, Publ. 1004460783).
Statutenänderung:
15.09.2021.
Sitz neu:
Volketswil.
Domizil neu:
Schützenweg 3, 8604 Volketswil.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schaufelberger, Jsabella, von Fischenthal, in Volketswil, Gesellschafterin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: in Uster];
Graf, Rolf, von Uster, in Volketswil, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, [bisher: in Uster].
Publication number: HR02-1004460783, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Jolly Jump GmbH, in Uster, CHE-109.561.854, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 42 vom 01.03.2013, Publ. 7084960).
Domizil neu:
Weststrasse 7, 8610 Uster.
Publication number: 7084960, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Jolly Jump GmbH, in Uster, CH-020.4.025.024-1, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 195 vom 08.10.2009, S. 26, Publ. 5282670).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Knöpfel, Gertrud, von Teufen AR, in Winterthur, Gesellschafterin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schaufelberger, Jsabella, von Fischenthal, in Uster, Gesellschafterin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin mit Einzelunterschrift und mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Graf, Rolf, von Uster, in Uster, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.