Address
c/o RBT AG
Plazza dal Mulin 6
7500 St. Moritz
Reports for Jetzer et Fils SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Jetzer et Fils SA
- Jetzer et Fils SA has its legal headquarters in St. Moritz and is active. It operates in the sector «Manufacturing of measurement and control instruments».
- Jetzer et Fils SA has one person entered in its management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 23.05.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-103.891.543.
- On the same address as Jetzer et Fils SA there are 21 other active companies registered. These include: Arrow Holding AG, Atelier Anna Ferré, Bata Schuh Stiftung.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.08.1962
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
St. Moritz
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.927.361-3
UID/VAT
CHE-103.891.543
Sector
Manufacturing of measurement and control instruments
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Entwicklung und Herstellung von, Handel mit und Vertrieb von Uhren und anderen technischen Produkten aller Art im In- und Ausland unter Einschluss von Import und Export; kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, mit anderen Unternehmen Lizenzverträge eingehen und dabei sowohl als Lizenzgeber wie auch als Lizenznehmer handeln sowie Grundeigentum erwerben, verwalten, vermieten und veräussern und irgendwelche Finanz- und Treuhandgeschäfte tätigen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Lienhard AG Revisions- & Steuerrechtspraxis | Zürich | <2004 | 09.01.2014 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Jetzer et Fils Ltd
- Jetzer et Fils AG
- Jetzer et Fils Inc
- Jetzer et Fils SA en liquidation
- Unitech Distribution AG
- Unitech Watches AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Jetzer et Fils SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006038176, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Jetzer et Fils SA, in St. Moritz, CHE-103.891.543, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 41 vom 28.02.2014, S.0, Publ. 1372209).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Jetzer, Lisette, von Kilchberg ZH, in La Punt-Chamues-ch, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jetzer, Mark, von Kilchberg (ZH), in La Punt Chamues-ch, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 1372173, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Jetzer et Fils SA, in Küsnacht ZH, CHE-103.891.543, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 6 vom 10.01.2014, Publ. 1276449). Die Gesellschaft wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach St. Moritz im Handelsregister des Kantons Graubünden eingetragen und im Handelsregister des Kantons Zürich von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Publication number: 1372209, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Jetzer et Fils SA, bisher in Küsnacht ZH, CHE-103.891.543, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 6 vom 10.01.2014, Publ. 1276449).
Gründungsstatuten:
16.10.1986.
Statutenänderung:
10.02.2014.
Sitz neu:
St. Moritz.
Domizil neu:
c/o RBT AG, Plazza dal Mulin 6, 7500 St. Moritz.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jetzer, Lisette, von Kilchberg ZH, in La Punt-Chamues-ch, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.