Reports for Jean-Bär-Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Jean-Bär-Stiftung
- Jean-Bär-Stiftung is currently active and the industry «Religious, political or secular associations». The legal headquarters are in Kesswil.
- The management of the organization Jean-Bär-Stiftung consists of 6 persons.
- The commercial register entry of the organization was last modified on 24.11.2023. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of TG under the UID CHE-110.187.685.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Evelyne Roth-Michel,
Barbara Frei-Rimathé,
Christian Johannes Herbst,
Vreni Gerber,
Hans Vogel jun.
newest authorized signatories
Evelyne Roth-Michel,
Barbara Frei-Rimathé,
Christian Johannes Herbst,
Vreni Gerber,
Hans Vogel jun.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.10.1930
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Dozwil
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.7.006.010-7
UID/VAT
CHE-110.187.685
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Stiftung zugunsten armer Kinder in den Wohngemeinden Kesswil und Dozwil sowie armer, alter Leute der Kirchgemeinden Kesswil, Dozwil und Uttwil.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PROVIDA Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | St. Gallen | 02.09.2021 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ES Treuhand, Sandra Eichmann | Uttwil | 04.07.2016 | 01.09.2021 | |
Treuhandbüro Daniel Bosshardt | Häggenschwil | 18.08.2009 | 03.07.2016 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Jean-Bär-Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005893517, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Jean-Bär-Stiftung, in Dozwil, CHE-110.187.685, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 170 vom 02.09.2021, Publ. 1005283085). [Teils-Aktualisierung der Funktionsbezeichnung.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wismer, Karin, von Birmensdorf ZH, in Kesswil, Mitglied, Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Präsident oder Vizepräsidentin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Präsident oder Vizepräsidentin.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Frei-Rimathé, Barbara, von Diepoldsau, in Winterthur, Vizepräsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: unbekannte Staatsangehörigkeit, Vizepräsidentin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Roth-Michel, Evelyne, von Kesswil, in Kesswil, Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten;
Gerber, Vreni, von Sumiswald, in Dozwil, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Präsident oder Vizepräsidentin [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Präsident oder Vizepräsidentin].
Publication number: HR02-1005283085, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Jean-Bär-Stiftung, in Dozwil, CHE-110.187.685, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 127 vom 04.07.2016, S.0, Publ. 2929819).
Weitere Adressen:
c/o Hans Vogel, Uttwilerstrasse 2a, 8593 Kesswil.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
ES Treuhand und Revision, Sandra Eichmann (CHE-397.987.329), in Uttwil, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Herbst, Christian, von Uttwil, in Uttwil, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: deutscher Staatsangehöriger, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
PROVIDA Wirtschaftsprüfung AG (CHE-106.067.173), in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 2929819, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Jean-Bär-Stiftung, in Dozwil, CHE-110.187.685, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 158 vom 18.08.2009, S. 18, Publ. 5201692).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stirnemann-Rimathé, Käthi, von Winterthur, in Kesswil, Vizepräsidentin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Treuhandbüro Daniel Bosshardt, in Häggenschwil (CH-320.1.031.018-0), Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Frei-Rimathé, Barbara, von Diepoldsau-Schmitter, in Winterthur, Vizepräsidentin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
ES Treuhand und Revision, Sandra Eichmann (CHE-397.987.329), in Uttwil, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.