Reports for Jakob Berger AG, Sägerei und Holzhandlung, Seewis-Pardisla
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Jakob Berger AG, Sägerei und Holzhandlung, Seewis-Pardisla
- Jakob Berger AG, Sägerei und Holzhandlung, Seewis-Pardisla has its legal headquarters in Seewis-Pardisla and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Sawmill operation».
- The company was founded on 05.07.1945.
- The last commercial register change was made on 15.01.2018. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- In the commercial register the company Jakob Berger AG, Sägerei und Holzhandlung, Seewis-Pardisla is registered under the UID CHE-105.822.837.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.07.1945
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Seewis im Prättigau
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.3.000.368-3
UID/VAT
CHE-105.822.837
Sector
Sawmill operation
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb einer Sägerei und Holzhandlung; kann ferner alle mit der Anlage ihres Vermögens in Verbindung stehenden Geschäfte auf eigene Rechnung oder auf Rechnung Dritter tätigen und sich ferner an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Prefera Audit AG | Sargans | 17.02.2010 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciar Treuhand AG | Chur | <2004 | 16.02.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Jakob Berger AG, Sägerei und Holzhandlung, Seewies-Pardisla
- Berger Jakob AG, Sägerei und Holzhandlung, Seewis-Pardisla
- Berger Jakob AG Sägerei und Holzhandlung, Seewis-Station
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Jakob Berger AG, Sägerei und Holzhandlung, Seewis-Pardisla
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3989355, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Jakob Berger AG, Sägerei und Holzhandlung, Seewis-Pardisla, in Seewis im Prättigau, CHE-105.822.837, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 254 vom 31.12.2015, Publ. 2573941).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lüchinger, Max, von Oberriet (SG), in Mels, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2573941, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Jakob Berger AG, Sägerei und Holzhandlung, Seewis-Pardisla, in Seewis im Prättigau, CHE-105.822.837, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 22 vom 01.02.2012, Publ. 6530248).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Berger-De Carlo, Stefan, von Wattenwil, in Landquart (Igis), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lüchinger, Patrick, von Oberriet SG, in Mels, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Prefera Audit AG (CHE-110.139.812), in Sargans, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Prefera Audit AG (CH-320.3.053.724-6)].
Publication number: 6530248, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Jakob Berger AG, Sägerei und Holzhandlung, Seewis-Pardisla, in Seewis im Prättigau, CH-350.3.000.368-3, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 206 vom 24.10.2011, S. 0, Publ. 6388924).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lüchinger, Max, von Oberriet SG, in Mels, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher:in Heiligkreuz (Mels), Präsident mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Bürki, Peter, von Altstätten und Oberegg, in Altstätten, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.