Reports for Jaguar Développement SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Jaguar Développement SA
- Jaguar Développement SA is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Morges. Jaguar Développement SA belongs to the industry «Connecting properties to local public utilities/infrastructure» and is currently active.
- Jaguar Développement SA has 3 persons entered in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 22.11.2023.
- The company Jaguar Développement SA is registered under the UID CHE-142.232.114.
- The address is identical with 4 other active companies. These include: CAFOM MARKETING ET SERVICES SA, F69 Immo SA, François Vaultier.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.10.2019
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Morges
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.187.341-0
UID/VAT
CHE-142.232.114
Sector
Connecting properties to local public utilities/infrastructure
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but toutes activités immobilières, notamment la planification et le développement de projets immobiliers, à l'exclusion de toutes opérations prohibées par la LFAIE (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Jaguar Développement SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005891401, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Jaguar Développement SA, à Morges, CHE-142.232.114 (FOSC du 26.07.2023, p. 0/1005804642). La signature de Bisson Thomas est radiée.
Publication number: HR02-1005804642, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Jaguar Développement SA, à Morges, CHE-142.232.114 (FOSC du 16.10.2019, p. 0/1004739196). La signature de Tahier Jean-Marie est radiée.
Publication number: HR01-1004739196, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Jaguar Développement SA, à Morges, Rue des Vignerons 1A, 1110 Morges, CHE-142.232.114. Nouvelle société anonyme.
Statuts:
24 septembre 2019.
But:
la société a pour but toutes activités immobilières, notamment la planification et le développement de projets immobiliers, à l'exclusion de toutes opérations prohibées par la LFAIE (pour but complet cf. statuts). Selon déclaration du 24 septembre 2019, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Capital-actions:
CHF 100'000, entièrement libéré, divisé en 20'000 actions nominatives de CHF 1, privilégiées quant au droit de vote, et 8'000 actions nominatives de CHF 10, toutes avec restrictions quant à la transmissibilité selon statuts.
Organe de publication:
Feuille officielle suisse du commerce.
Communications aux actionnaires:
par écrit ou par courriel.
Administration:
Kohn Pierre, à Lausanne, président, avec signature collective à deux, et Vaultier François, à Echichens, avec signature individuelle, tous deux de France. Signature collective à deux est conférée à Bisson Thomas, à Divonne-les-Bains (France), Tahier Jean-Marie, à Lausanne, tous deux de France, et Rigoli Karina, de Vernier, à Echichens, directeurs.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.