Address
Weissenbrunnenstrasse 43
8903 Birmensdorf ZH
Reports for iten metal hoses AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout iten metal hoses AG
- iten metal hoses AG with its legal headquarters in Birmensdorf ZH is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Production of metal goods». iten metal hoses AG is active.
- The management of the company iten metal hoses AG consists of 3 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 09.02.2017.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 26.02.2024.
- iten metal hoses AG is registered in the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-215.986.033.
- On the same address there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: Franz Iten AG, KMU Holding Immobilien AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.02.2017
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Birmensdorf (ZH)
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.041.077-5
UID/VAT
CHE-215.986.033
Sector
Production of metal goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Entwicklung, Herstellung, Konfektion und den Handel von technischen Industriekomponenten sowie die Erbringung der damit verbundenen Dienstleistungen für Industrie und Gewerbe. Sie kann Verträge abschliessen und alle Verträge eingehen, die direkt oder indirekt mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft in Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann Urheberrechte, Lizenzen, Patente und andere immaterielle Güter erwerben, belasten, verwalten und veräussern. Sie kann weiter Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern, Zweigniederlassungen errichten und sich an Unternehmungen beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann Darlehen, Garantien und andere Arten der Finanzierung und von Sicherheitsleistungen gewähren.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fides Experta AG | Zürich | 17.09.2018 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Wermelinger Family Holding AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
iten | 20.02.2019 | active | 79332/2018 |
Newest SOGC notifications: iten metal hoses AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005970045, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
iten metal hoses AG, in Birmensdorf (ZH), CHE-215.986.033, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 37 vom 22.02.2022, Publ. 1005411052).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lienert, André Walter, von Winterthur, in Pfyn, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005411052, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
iten metal hoses AG, in Birmensdorf (ZH), CHE-215.986.033, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 220 vom 11.11.2021, Publ. 1005331483).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lienert, André Walter, von Winterthur, in Pfyn, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005331483, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
iten metal hoses AG, in Birmensdorf (ZH), CHE-215.986.033, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 246 vom 19.12.2019, Publ. 1004787452).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Angi, Bektas, von Chur, in Berikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wettstein, Marco, von Künten, in Reiden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.