Reports for Itaphor SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Itaphor SA
- Itaphor SA is active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Montagnola.
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 19.02.1963.
- The last commercial register change was made on 28.06.2021. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company's UID is CHE-102.674.960.
- ESSE Real Estate Sagl, Ginger Società di Partecipazioni e di Finanziamenti SA, Unitrust AG have the same address as Itaphor SA.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.02.1963
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Collina d'Oro
Commercial Registry Office
TI
Commercial register number
CH-514.3.000.054-2
UID/VAT
CHE-102.674.960
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language)
L'acquisto, il finanziamento, l'amministrazione e la vendita di immobili e partecipazioni in Svizzera e all'estero, nonché l'esecuzione di promozioni immobiliari; l'acquisto lo sviluppo e la vendita di patenti, diritti di licenza e know how. La società potrà inoltre acquistare e vendere beni di qualsiasi natura sia in proprio che per conto terzi, agire quale commissionario, effettuare mediazioni e consulenze ed in genere esplicare ogni operazione finanziaria e commerciale necessaria o utile per il conseguimento dello scopo sociale.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PMI Fiduciaria e Revisioni SA | Cadempino | 28.06.2018 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Della Chiesa Diego | Lugano | 20.04.2009 | 27.06.2018 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Itaphor Società fiduciaria e di gestione SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Itaphor SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005230751, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
Itaphor SA, in Collina d'Oro, CHE-102.674.960, società anonima (Nr. FUSC 123 del 28.06.2018, Pubbl. 4322141).
Nuove azioni:
200 azioni nominative da CHF 500.00 [finora: 200 azioni al portatore da CHF 500.00]. In data 01.05.2021 le azioni al portatore sono state convertite per legge in azioni nominative. Gli statuti della società non sono ancora stati adeguati;
l'adeguamento deve avvenire in occasione della prossima modifica statutaria.
Publication number: 4322141, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
Itaphor SA, in Collina d'Oro, CHE-102.674.960, società anonima (Nr. FUSC 201 del 17.10.2016, Pubbl. 3111469).
Persone dimissionarie e firme cancellate:
Della Chiesa Diego (CH-501.1.012.569-0), in Lugano, ufficio di revisione.
Nuove persone iscritte o modifiche:
PMI Fiduciaria e Revisioni SA (CHE-415.000.643), in Cadempino, ufficio di revisione.
Publication number: 3111469, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
Itaphor SA, in Collina d'Oro, CHE-102.674.960, società anonima (FUSC no. 114 del 15.06.2016, Pubbl. 2891883).
Statuti modificati:
27.07.2016, 11.10.2016.
Nuovo scopo:
L'acquisto, il finanziamento, l'amministrazione e la vendita di immobili e partecipazioni in Svizzera e all'estero, nonché l'esecuzione di promozioni immobiliari;
l'acquisto lo sviluppo e la vendita di patenti, diritti di licenza e know how. La società potrà inoltre acquistare e vendere beni di qualsiasi natura sia in proprio che per conto terzi, agire quale commissionario, effettuare mediazioni e consulenze ed in genere esplicare ogni operazione finanziaria e commerciale necessaria o utile per il conseguimento dello scopo sociale.
Nuovo capitale azionario:
CHF 100'000.00 [finora: CHF 300'000.00].
Nuovo capitale azionario liberato:
CHF 100'000.00 [finora: CHF 300'000.00].
Nuove azioni:
200 azioni al portatore da CHF 500.00. [finora: 600 azioni al portatore da CHF 500.00]. Riduzione del capitale ai sensi dell'art. 732 CO da CHF 300'000.00 a CHF 100'000.00 mediante annullamento di 400 azioni al portatore di nominali CHF 500 e rimborso agli azionisti. Le formalità previste dall'art. 734 CO sono state constatate con atto pubblico del 11.10.2016.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.