Reports for ISMAT GROUP SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout ISMAT GROUP SA
- ISMAT GROUP SA is currently active and the industry «Leasing of intangible assets». The legal headquarters are in Morges.
- The management of the company ISMAT GROUP SA, which was founded on the 31.07.2007, consists of 7 persons.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 12.08.2024.
- In the commercial register the company ISMAT GROUP SA is registered under the UID CHE-113.754.729.
- There are currently 2 trademarks or applications for the company ISMAT GROUP SA in the IPI database.
- On the same address there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: Biings Technologies SA, Claire Thévenard Recruitment.
Management (7)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Isabelle Gessler,
Jean-Maurice Cailler,
Amina Belkhiria,
David Cochet,
Franck Czapski
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
31.07.2007
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Morges
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-217.3.538.382-6
UID/VAT
CHE-113.754.729
CHE-179.456.228 VAT
Sector
Leasing of intangible assets
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but la détention de participations et de droits de propriété intellectuelle (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire FIDAG SA, succursale de Lausanne (VD) | Lausanne | 15.09.2021 | 11.08.2024 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Revica Sàrl | Epalinges | 03.07.2018 | 14.09.2021 | |
Fiducom SA | Marly | 03.12.2013 | 02.07.2018 | |
CRF Cabinet de Revision et de Fiscalité SA | Marly | 07.08.2007 | 02.12.2013 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- ISMAT CONSULTING SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
26.03.2024 | active | 16817/2023 | |
BIINGS | 13.11.2013 | active | 62292/2013 |
Newest SOGC notifications: ISMAT GROUP SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006104822, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
ISMAT GROUP SA, à Morges, CHE-113.754.729 (FOSC du 30.04.2024, p. 0/1006021767). Cailler Jean-Maurice n'est plus président. Gessler Isabelle, de Sion, à Conthey, est membre présidente du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1006021767, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
ISMAT GROUP SA, à Morges, CHE-113.754.729 (FOSC du 22.04.2024, p. 0/1006014799). Feret Gregory n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Cailler Jean-Maurice, de Vevey, à Conthey, est membre président du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1006014799, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
ISMAT GROUP SA, à Morges, CHE-113.754.729 (FOSC du 07.02.2024, p. 0/1005955410). La signature de Russier Céline et Emmenegger Julie est radiée. Signature collective à deux est conférée à Belkhiria Amina, de Lausanne, à Genève, directrice, Cochet David, de France, à Collonge-Bellerive, directeur, et Czapski Franck, de France, à Groisy (France), directeur.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.