Reports for Isler Motorräder GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Isler Motorräder GmbH
- Isler Motorräder GmbH in Oberrohrdorf is a Limited liability company from the sector «Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles». Isler Motorräder GmbH is active.
- The company was founded on 27.06.2019 and has 2 persons in its management.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 01.10.2019. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of AG under the UID CHE-442.308.486.
- A&P Partner GmbH, Aventus Generalunternehmung AG are registered at the same address.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.06.2019
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Oberrohrdorf
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.4.446.098-4
UID/VAT
CHE-442.308.486
Sector
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit und Reparatur von Motorrädern; kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Sicherheiten für Verbindlichkeiten verbundener Gesellschaften abgeben.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Isler Motorräder GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004727595, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Isler Motorräder GmbH, in Oberrohrdorf, CHE-442.308.486, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 125 vom 02.07.2019, Publ. 1004665326).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Isler, Harold, von Bellikon, in Wettingen, Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Isler, Thomas, von Bellikon, in Remetschwil, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, ohne Stammanteil].
Publication number: HR01-1004665326, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Isler Motorräder GmbH, in Oberrohrdorf, CHE-442.308.486, Vorderi Böde 3, 5452 Oberrohrdorf, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
21.06.2019.
Zweck:
Handel mit und Reparatur von Motorrädern;
kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Sicherheiten für Verbindlichkeiten verbundener Gesellschaften abgeben.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.00.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände:
Sacheinlage/Sachübernahme: Die Gesellschaft übernimmt bei der Gründung von Harold Isler, in Wettingen, das Geschäft des nicht im Handelsregister eingetragenen Einzelunternehmens Isler Motorräder, in Oberrohrdorf, gemäss Vertrag vom 21.06.2019 und Übernahmebilanz per 31.12.2018 mit Aktiven von CHF 270'712.53 und Passiven von CHF 249'412.48, wofür 200 Stammanteile zu CHF 100.00 ausgegeben und CHF 1'300.05 als Forderung gutgeschrieben werden.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen an die Gesellschafter erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax an die im Anteilbuch verzeichneten Adressen. Gemäss Erklärung aller Gründer vom 21.06.2019 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Isler, Harold, von Bellikon, in Wettingen, Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Isler, Thomas, von Bellikon, in Remetschwil, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Isler, Marianne, von Bellikon, in Remetschwil, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.