Address
c/o Kim Rochat
Rue du Pâquis 11 A
1033 Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne
Reports for Ipros Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Ipros Sàrl
- Ipros Sàrl is active in the industry «IT services» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne.
- There are 5 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 28.07.2021.
- The company's UID is CHE-114.642.375.
Management (5)
Executive board
Christos Tsagkalidis,
Kim Julien Rochat,
Prof. Dr. Rémy Glardon
newest authorized signatories
Christos Tsagkalidis,
Kim Julien Rochat,
Prof. Dr. Rémy Glardon
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.12.2008
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.056.419-4
UID/VAT
CHE-114.642.375
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Le développement et la commercialisation de plateformes logicielles relatives à l'étude et à l'amélioration de réseaux d'ajout de valeur ainsi que le développement d'activités de conseil dans le domaine de l'organisation d'entreprise.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Ipros Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005259887, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Ipros Sàrl, à Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne, CHE-114.642.375 (FOSC du 22.05.2020, p. 0/1004894956). Horcajada Rodriguez Diego, qui n'est plus associé-gérant et dont la signature est radiée, cède ses 44 parts de CHF 100, par 22 parts de CHF 100, chacun, aux associés-gérants Glardon Rémy, désormais titulaire de 66 parts de CHF 100, et Tsagkalidis Christos, désormais titulaire de 66 parts de CHF 100. Vannini Elena, qui n'est plus associée, cède ses 22 parts de CHF 100 à l'associé-gérant Rochat Kim, désormais titulaire de 66 parts de CHF 100, qui est nommé président.
Publication number: HR02-1004894956, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Ipros Sàrl, à Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne, CHE-114.642.375 (FOSC du 09.05.2018, p. 0/4221133). L'associé-gérant Glardon Rémy cède 41 de ses 85 parts de CHF 100 par 22 parts de CHF 100 à Vannini Elena, d'Italie, à Saint-Sulpice (VD), par 11 parts de CHF 100 à Beall Rémi, de et à Seelisberg, et par 8 parts de CHF 100 à Ipros Sàrl (CHE-114.642.375), à Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne, les trois nouveaux associés avec respectivement 22, 11 et 8 parts de CHF 100, sans signature;
Glardon Rémy, désormais à Bussigny, reste titulaire de 44 parts de CHF 100. L'associé-gérant Rochat Kim, qui n'est plus président, cède 91 de ses 135 parts de CHF 100 par 44 parts de CHF 100 à Tsagkalidis Christos, de Grèce, à Lausanne, par 44 parts de CHF 100 à Horcajada Rodriguez Diego, d'Espagne, à Saint-Sulpice (VD), président, tous deux nouveaux associés avec 44 parts de CHF 100, gérants avec signature collective à deux, et par 3 parts de CHF 100 à l'associée Ipros Sàrl (CHE-114.642.375), à Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne, désormais titulaire de 11 parts de CHF 100;
Rochat Kim reste titulaire de 44 parts de CHF 100.
Publication number: 4221133, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Ipros Sàrl, à Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne, CHE-114.642.375 (FOSC du 28.04.2017, p. 0/3492771). Tsagkalidis Christos, qui n'est plus associé-gérant et dont la signature est radiée, cède ses 70 parts de CHF 100, par 35 parts de CHF 100 chacun aux associés-gérants Rochat Kim, désormais titulaire de 135 parts de CHF 100, et Glardon Rémy, désormais titulaire de 85 parts de CHF 100.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.