Reports for Inter-Ibex consulting SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Inter-Ibex consulting SA
- Inter-Ibex consulting SA has its legal headquarters in Préverenges, is active and operates in the sector «IT services».
- There is one active person registered in the management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 14.11.2018, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company Inter-Ibex consulting SA is registered under the UID CHE-108.541.576.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.01.1997
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Préverenges
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.143.501-4
UID/VAT
CHE-108.541.576
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Toutes prestations de service dans les domaines de la gestion et de l'organisation d'entreprises, du traitement et de la gestion de l'information, des services et des droits liés à la communication.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ofico Fiduciaire SA | Lausanne | <2004 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Inter-Ibex consulting SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004497834, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Inter-Ibex consulting S.A., à Préverenges, CHE-108.541.576 (FOSC du 18.10.2017, p. 0/3817845). Sel Mustafa n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Eskandari Babak, qui n'est plus président, reste seul administrateur et continue à signer individuellement.
Publication number: 3817845, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Inter-Ibex consulting S.A., à Préverenges, CHE-108.541.576 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834). Eskandari Babak est nommé président et continue à signer individuellement.
Nouvel administrateur avec signature individuelle:
Sel Mustafa, de Blonay, à Epalinges.
Publication number: 6943562, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Inter-Ibex consulting S.A., à Préverenges, CH-550-0143501-4, toute prestation de service dans les domaines de la gestion et de l'organisation d'entreprises, du traitement et de la gestion de l'information, des services et des droits liés à la communication (FOSC du 29.06.2011, p. 0/6227712). Schaller Jean-Pierre n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Eskandari Babak, qui n'est plus secrétaire, signe désormais individuellement.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.