Reports for Inter-Confort S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Inter-Confort S.A.
- Inter-Confort S.A. is currently active and the industry «Trading in household appliances and related goods». The legal headquarters are in Bévilard.
- Inter-Confort S.A. was founded on 01.04.1985.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 16.02.2023.
- Inter-Confort S.A. is registered in the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-103.660.386.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Raphaël Marc Choffat,
Noémie Choffat-Jost,
Julien Jost,
Jacqueline Jost-Stettler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.04.1985
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Valbirse
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-073.3.001.185-0
UID/VAT
CHE-103.660.386
Sector
Trading in household appliances and related goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La distribution de tous biens mobiliers, spécialement de meubles. La société peut effectuer toutes opérations commerciales et financières, mobilières et immobilières, en rapport direct ou indirect avec son but social ou aptes à le favoriser. La société peut créer des succursales, en Suisse et à l'étranger, participer à d'autres entreprises et faire toutes opérations et conclure tous contrats propres à développer son but ou s'y rapportant directement ou indirectement.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Jean-Michel Blanchard | Valbirse | <2004 | 23.02.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Inter-Confort SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Inter-Confort S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005679857, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Inter-Confort S.A., à Valbirse, CHE-103.660.386, société anonyme (No. FOSC 243 du 14.12.2020, Publ. 1005046199).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Choffat, Raphaël Marc, de Coeuve, à Tramelan, directeur, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005046199, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Inter-Confort S.A., à Valbirse, CHE-103.660.386, société anonyme (No. FOSC 180 du 16.09.2016, Publ. 3058517).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Stettler, Markus, dit Marc, de Bolligen, à Bévilard (Valbirse), membre et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Choffat-Jost, Noémie, de Coeuve et Fahrni, à Tramelan, membre et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle;
Jost, Julien, de Fahrni, à Sonceboz-Sombeval, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: 3058517, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Inter-Confort S.A., à Valbirse, CHE-103.660.386, société anonyme (No. FOSC 57 du 24.03.2015, Publ. 2059593).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Jost, André, de Fahrni, à Bévilard (Valbirse), président, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Jost-Stettler, Jacqueline, de Fahrni, à Bévilard (Valbirse), présidente du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: administratrice, avec signature collective à deux];
Stettler, Markus, dit Marc, de Bolligen, à Bévilard (Valbirse), membre et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: Stettler, Marc, vice-président, avec signature collective à deux].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.