Reports for Integral Consulting GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Integral Consulting GmbH
- Integral Consulting GmbH has its legal headquarters in Zürich and is active. It operates in the sector «Services regarding management consulting».
- The management consists of 3 persons. The company was founded on 13.11.2017.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 26.07.2021.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of ZH is CHE-254.922.485.
- There are 32 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: anderline gmbh, Asian Contemporary Fine Arts GmbH, Baumberger Beratung GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.11.2017
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.063.039-6
UID/VAT
CHE-254.922.485
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Coaching im Bereich Career Reinvention, Business Model Generation & Value Proposition Design, Emotional Intelligence Training und Unternehmensberatung in den Bereichen Unternehmensführung, Strategie, Organisation, Weiterbildung. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten und finanzieren, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, Vertretungen übernehmen, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnungen vornehmen, Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen sowie Grundstücke und Immobilien erwerben, verwalten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann Beteiligungen, Lizenzen, Patente und Handelsmarken halten, erwerben, verwalten und verwerten. Ferner kann sie alle Geschäfte die zur Erreichung und Förderung des Gesellschaftszweckes geeignet sind tätigen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Integral Consulting GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005257363, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Integral Consulting GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-254.922.485, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 199 vom 15.10.2019, Publ. 1004737526).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
O'Connor, David Christopher, irischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 118 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Diem, Maximilian, von Zürich, in Winterthur, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 80 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Tirendi, Maria, von Zürich, in Zürich, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 2 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Publication number: HR02-1004737526, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Integral Consulting GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-254.922.485, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 244 vom 15.12.2017, Publ. 3933397).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Tirendi, Maria, von Zürich, in Zürich, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
O'Connor, David Christopher, irischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Publication number: 3933397, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Integral Consulting GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-254.922.485, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 223 vom 16.11.2017, Publ. 3872395).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
O'Connor, David Christopher, irischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Tirendi, Maria, von Zürich, in Zürich, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.