Address
c/o Administration communale
Place du Village 1
1872 Troistorrents
Reports for Installations de sports et loisirs Morgins SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Installations de sports et loisirs Morgins SA
- Installations de sports et loisirs Morgins SA is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Troistorrents. Installations de sports et loisirs Morgins SA belongs to the industry «Sport services» and is currently active.
- The company was founded on 28.09.2010 and has 5 persons in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 14.09.2023.
- The company's UID is CHE-116.028.996.
Management (5)
newest board members
Sarah Wassmer-Joris,
Charles Clerc,
Nicolas Gabriel Premand,
Roland Tagan,
Oscar Dubosson
newest authorized signatories
Sarah Wassmer-Joris,
Charles Clerc,
Nicolas Gabriel Premand,
Roland Tagan,
Oscar Dubosson
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.09.2010
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Troistorrents
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.3.007.499-7
UID/VAT
CHE-116.028.996
Sector
Sport services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Développement et exploitation des installations de sports et de loisirs de la station de Morgins (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
NOFIVAL SA | Martigny | 04.10.2010 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Installations de sports et loisirs Morgins SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005838430, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Installations de sports et loisirs Morgins SA, à Troistorrents, CHE-116.028.996, société anonyme (No. FOSC 125 du 30.06.2022, Publ. 1005509207).
Nouvelle adresse:
c/o Administration communale, Place du Village 1, Case Postale 65, 1872 Troistorrents.
Publication number: HR02-1005509207, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Installations de sports et loisirs Morgins SA, à Troistorrents, CHE-116.028.996, société anonyme (No. FOSC 113 du 14.06.2017, Publ. 3579839).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Michaud, Jacques, de Troistorrents, à Troistorrents, président, avec signature collective à deux;
Dubosson, Cédric, de Troistorrents, à Troistorrents, vice-président, avec signature collective à deux;
Chessex, Guy, de Montreux, à Troistorrents, administrateur, secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux avec le président ou le vice-président.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Clerc, Charles, de Siviriez, à Troistorrents, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: administrateur, avec signature collective à deux avec le président ou le vice-président];
Wassmer-Joris, Sarah, de Orsières, à Troistorrents, vice-présidente du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Premand, Nicolas, de Troistorrents, à Troistorrents, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux avec le président ou le vice-président;
Tagan, Roland, de Troistorrents, à Troistorrents, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux avec le président ou le vice-président.
Publication number: 3579839, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Installations de sports et loisirs Morgins SA, à Troistorrents, CHE-116.028.996, société anonyme (No. FOSC 1 du 04.01.2016, Publ. 2575565).
Modification des statuts:
07.06.2017.
Nouveau but:
développement et exploitation des installations de sports et de loisirs de la station de Morgins (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.