Reports for inroi ag
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout inroi ag
- inroi ag is currently active and the industry «Trading in IT and communications products». The legal headquarters are in Luzern.
- There are 2 active persons registered in the management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 14.05.2014. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of LU under the UID CHE-112.932.069.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.05.2006
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Horw
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.786.443-2
UID/VAT
CHE-112.932.069
Sector
Trading in IT and communications products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im IT- und Kommunikationsbereich, insbesondere Handel mit Produkten (Hardware und Software), Installation (auch im Elektro- und Gasbereich), Beratung und Support; Erwerb, Entwicklung, Verwaltung und Verwertung von Patenten, Lizenzen und Herstellungsverfahren; Handel mit Waren und Erzeugnissen aller Art; Finanzierung und Förderung von Geschäften jeglicher Art; Erwerb und Veräusserung von Grundstücken; Beteiligungen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Landolt Steuer- und Unternehmensberatung AG | Hergiswil (NW) | 13.02.2008 | 17.12.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: inroi ag
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 1500973, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
inroi ag, in Horw, CHE-112.932.069, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 246 vom 18.12.2008, S. 15, Publ. 4788532).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ineichen, Hans, von Luzern und Emmen, in Luzern, Präsident, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ineichen, Philipp, von Luzern und Emmen, in Luzern, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 4788532, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
inroi ag, in Horw, CH-100.3.786.443-2, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 30 vom 13.02.2008, S. 8, Publ. 4336924).
Statutenänderung:
9.12.2008. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 09.12.2008 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Landolt Steuer- und Unternehmensberatung AG, in Hergiswil NW (CH-150.3.000.608-4), Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 4336924, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
inroi ag, in Horw, CH-100.3.786.443-2, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 220 vom 13.11.2006, S. 9, Publ. 3633126).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schmidli, Alois, von Root, in Root, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ineichen, Hans, von Luzern und Emmen, in Luzern, Präsident, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Ineichen, Ivo, von Luzern und Emmen, in Luzern, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Ineichen, Philipp, von Luzern und Emmen, in Luzern, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident];
Landolt Steuer- und Unternehmensberatung AG, in Hergiswil NW (CH-150.3.000.608-4), Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.