Branches (6)
Reports for Inevo AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Inevo AG
- Inevo AG has its legal headquarters in Suhr and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Other building work (incl. Interior finishing)».
- There are 14 active persons registered in the management.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 21.12.2022. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- Inevo AG is registered in the Canton of AG under the UID CHE-106.101.019.
- There are 5 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Möbel-Pfister AG, Pfister Professional GmbH, Versicherungskasse der Möbel-Pfister AG.
Management (14)
newest board members
Rudolf Daniel Obrecht,
Reto Welte,
Bertrand Gabriel Lefort,
Ivan Guido Bosin
newest authorized signatories
Catherine Forster,
Christian Meier,
Michael Manuel Baldauf,
Dominik Patrick Tabaka,
Markus Kalberer
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.07.1993
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Suhr
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.015.335-3
UID/VAT
CHE-106.101.019
Sector
Other building work (incl. Interior finishing)
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Vornahme von Innenausbauten, Einrichtungen und Dienstleistungen als Einzelanbieter und Gesamtplaner in den Bereichen Möbel, Büromöbel, Bodenbeläge, Textilien und anderen Einrichtungsgegenständen sowie den Handel mit Produkten aus diesen Sortimenten. Sie bearbeitet Objekte im Bereich öffentlicher Bauten, im Hotel-, Gast- und Industriegewerbe, im Gesundheits- und Pflegebereich, im Verwaltungs- und Dienstleistungsbereich sowie im Privatbereich. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Mutter-, Schwester- und Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Basel | 19.11.2021 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
MSZ Group AG Zug | Zug | 09.10.2020 | 18.11.2021 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Inevo SA
- Pfister PROFESSIONAL AG
- Pfister PROFESSIONAL SA
- Interior Service AG
- Möbel Pfister Interior Service AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Inevo AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005634819, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Inevo AG, in Suhr, CHE-106.101.019, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 128 vom 05.07.2022, Publ. 1005512855).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Carey, Silvia, von Boningen, in Arni (AG), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Forster, Catherine, von Lausanne, in Basel, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005512855, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Inevo AG, in Suhr, CHE-106.101.019, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 122 vom 27.06.2022, Publ. 1005505513).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Baldauf, Michael Manuel, von Zürich, in Uster, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Meier, Christian, von Würenlingen, in Horw, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien beschränkt auf den Hauptsitz].
Publication number: HR02-1005505513, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Pfister PROFESSIONAL AG, in Suhr, CHE-106.101.019, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 48 vom 09.03.2022, Publ. 1005423341).
Statutenänderung:
20.06.2022.
Firma neu:
Inevo AG.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(Inevo SA).
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Vornahme von Innenausbauten, Einrichtungen und Dienstleistungen als Einzelanbieter und Gesamtplaner in den Bereichen Möbel, Büromöbel, Bodenbeläge, Textilien und anderen Einrichtungsgegenständen sowie den Handel mit Produkten aus diesen Sortimenten. Sie bearbeitet Objekte im Bereich öffentlicher Bauten, im Hotel-, Gast- und Industriegewerbe, im Gesundheits- und Pflegebereich, im Verwaltungs- und Dienstleistungsbereich sowie im Privatbereich. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Mutter-, Schwester- und Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.