Branches (4)
Reports for Inelplan AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Inelplan AG
- Inelplan AG is currently active and the industry «Architectural and engineering activities». The legal headquarters are in St. Gallen.
- The management of the company Inelplan AG, which was founded on the 01.04.2008, consists of 5 persons.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 05.08.2022. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The UID registered in the commercial register of SG is CHE-114.154.288.
- There are 9 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Aerocom GmbH & Co. Communicationssysteme, Schwäbisch Gmünd (DE), Zweigniederlassung St. Gallen, DIE Sportmanager GmbH, Gipsergeschäft Sergio De Luca.
Management (5)
newest board members
Jakob Göldi,
Thomas Müller,
Christoph Remund,
Reto Fritsche,
Beat Nadig
newest authorized signatories
Jakob Göldi,
Thomas Müller,
Christoph Remund,
Reto Fritsche,
Beat Nadig
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.04.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
St. Gallen
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.063.056-4
UID/VAT
CHE-114.154.288
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Unabhängige und neutrale Beratung, Planung und Bauleitung von Elektroanlagen jeglicher Art. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an andern Unternehmen beteiligen, Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten sowie Immobilien erwerben, belasten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Schlegel Treuhand AG | Walenstadt | 07.04.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Inelplan AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005535862, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Inelplan AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-114.154.288, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 75 vom 20.04.2020, Publ. 1004873636).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Loop, Susanna, von Walenstadt, in Walenstadt, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Zweigniederlassung neu:
Walenstadt (CHE-217.274.742) [bisher: Walenstadt (CH-320.9.063.202-7)]. Buchs (CHE-473.496.946) [bisher: Buchs SG (CH-320.9.063.203-5)]. Rapperswil-Jona (CHE-250.200.559) [bisher: Rapperswil-Jona (CH-320.9.071.931-2)]. [Anpassung betr. Zweigniederlassungen aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften].
Publication number: HR02-1004873636, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Inelplan AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-114.154.288, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 170 vom 04.09.2017, S.0, Publ. 3731085).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Loop, Wilhelm genannt Willi, von Walenstadt, in Walenstadt, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schlegel Treuhand AG (CHE-107.297.899), in Walenstadt, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Schlegel Treuhand AG, in Walenstadt (CH-320.3.026.923-5)].
Publication number: 3731085, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Inelplan AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-114.154.288, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 91 vom 11.05.2017, Publ. 3515905).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Loop, Susanna, von Walenstadt, in Walenstadt, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Loop, Susanne, in Tscherlach (Walenstadt)];
Loop, Wilhelm genannt Willi, von Walenstadt, in Walenstadt, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Tscherlach (Walenstadt)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.