Address
Rue des Champs-Lovats 6
1400 Yverdon-les-Bains
Reports for Indutec Control Systems SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Indutec Control Systems SA
- Indutec Control Systems SA is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Yverdon-les-Bains. Indutec Control Systems SA belongs to the industry «Manufacturing of other electrical equipment/appliances» and is currently active.
- There are 3 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 15.06.2021.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Indutec Control Systems SA is the following: CHE-106.606.236.
Management (3)
newest board members
Marc-Antoine Viquerat,
Jean-Philippe Agassis,
Fabrice Hiertzeler
newest authorized signatories
Marc-Antoine Viquerat,
Jean-Philippe Agassis,
Fabrice Hiertzeler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.04.1990
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Yverdon-les-Bains
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.009.026-1
UID/VAT
CHE-106.606.236
Sector
Manufacturing of other electrical equipment/appliances
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Conception et réalisation d'automatismes industriels.
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
DFG Fiduciaire SA | Echallens | 21.12.2018 | 14.06.2021 | |
Fiduciaire Deuber & Beuret SA | Cortaillod | 02.07.2008 | 20.12.2018 | |
Treuhand Zofingen AG | Zofingen | <2004 | 01.07.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Indutec Control Systems SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005217950, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Indutec Control Systems SA, à Yverdon-les-Bains, CHE-106.606.236 (FOSC du 18.12.2019, p. 0/1004787068). Selon déclaration du 06.04.2021, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte. DFG Fiduciaire SA (CHE-325.517.290) n'est plus organe de révision.
Publication number: HR02-1004787068, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Indutec Control Systems SA, à Yverdon-les-Bains, CHE-106.606.236 (FOSC du 21.12.2018, p. 0/1004528396). Molière Gilbert n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée.
Publication number: HR02-1004528490, Commercial Registry Office Neuenburg, (645)
Indutec Control Systems SA, à Cortaillod, CHE-106.606.236 (FOSC du 26.02.2018, p. 0/4077797). Par suite du transfert de son siège à Yverdon-les-Bains, la société est inscrite au registre du commerce du canton de Vaud. Par conséquent, elle est radiée d'office du registre du commerce de Neuchâtel.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.