Reports for IMT Masken und Teilungen AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout IMT Masken und Teilungen AG
- IMT Masken und Teilungen AG from Greifensee operates in the sector «Manufacturing and processing of glass and ceramic» and is active.
- The management of the company IMT Masken und Teilungen AG, which was founded on the 12.10.1990, consists of 5 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 18.12.2020.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company IMT Masken und Teilungen AG is the following: CHE-106.686.732.
- 2 various trademarks or applications have been registered by the company IMT Masken und Teilungen AG in the IPI.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Prof. Dr. Lutz Rissing,
Rahel Martina Günsberg,
Winfried Arens,
Eugen Gossauer,
Peter Kirkegaard
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.10.1990
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Greifensee
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.902.850-7
UID/VAT
CHE-106.686.732
Sector
Manufacturing and processing of glass and ceramic
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Herstellung und den Vertrieb von elektronischen Geräten und Systemen, Peripheriegeräten, Präzisionsteilungen, mikrolithografischen Erzeugnissen und verwandten Artikeln aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Zürich | 24.10.2017 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Zürich | 24.12.2008 | 23.10.2017 | |
Rekonta Revisions AG | Zürich | <2004 | 23.12.2008 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Baumer IMT Industrielle Messtechnik AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
05.02.2001 | active | 07853/2000 | |
IMT | 05.02.2001 | active | 07852/2000 |
Newest SOGC notifications: IMT Masken und Teilungen AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005051411, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
IMT Masken und Teilungen AG, in Greifensee, CHE-106.686.732, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 131 vom 10.07.2019, Publ. 1004672022).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hauswirth, Michael, von Oeschgen, in Rüti ZH, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Rieck, Jürgen, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Volketswil, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004672022, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
IMT Masken und Teilungen AG, in Greifensee, CHE-106.686.732, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 206 vom 24.10.2017, Publ. 3826811).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sesselmann, Dr. Thomas, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Tittmoning (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Kleeb, Markus, von Zürich, in Uster, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rissing, Prof. Dr. Lutz, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in München (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kirkegaard, Peter, dänischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Arens, Winfried, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Sirnach, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: in Fischenthal];
Günsberg, Rahel, von Glarus, in Bassersdorf, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Rieck, Jürgen, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Volketswil, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: 3826811, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
IMT Masken und Teilungen AG, in Greifensee, CHE-106.686.732, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 6 vom 10.01.2014, Publ. 1276837).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ernst & Young AG (CH-020.9.001.069-0), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kirkegaard, Peter, dänischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Männedorf];
BDO AG (CHE-105.952.747), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle;
Arens, Winfried, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Fischenthal, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: in Uster].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.