Reports for ImmobilienGenossenschaft Oberaargau
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout ImmobilienGenossenschaft Oberaargau
- ImmobilienGenossenschaft Oberaargau has its legal headquarters in Wiedlisbach and is active. It is a Cooperative and active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The management of the organization ImmobilienGenossenschaft Oberaargau, which was founded on the 17.10.1891, consists of 7 persons.
- The organization has last modified its commercial register entry on 03.01.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is CHE-107.234.976.
Management (7)
newest members of the administration
Katja Bevilacqua-Zuber,
Daniel Luder,
Christoph Fankhauser,
Dr. Ursula Grob,
Renate Grunder-Schärer
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Marcel Geisseler,
Katja Bevilacqua-Zuber,
Christoph Fankhauser
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.10.1891
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Wiedlisbach
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.5.007.394-2
UID/VAT
CHE-107.234.976
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Genossenschaft bezweckt die Bereitstellung von Infrastruktur für das Wohnen, Betreuen und Pflegen von betagten Menschen sowie von Menschen mit einer Behinderung. Die Genossenschaft kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen oder solche gründen und alle Geschäfte tätigen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Genossenschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Langenthal | 27.04.2016 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
LMK Revisions AG | Langenthal | 14.05.2008 | 26.04.2016 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Genossenschaft Oberaargauisches Pflegeheim Wiedlisbach
- Oberaargauisches Pflegeheim Wiedlisbach
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: ImmobilienGenossenschaft Oberaargau
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005924331, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
ImmobilienGenossenschaft Oberaargau, in Wiedlisbach, CHE-107.234.976, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 103 vom 31.05.2023, Publ. 1005756644).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Geisseler, Marcel, von Sursee, in Madiswil, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005756644, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
ImmobilienGenossenschaft Oberaargau, in Wiedlisbach, CHE-107.234.976, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 217 vom 08.11.2022, Publ. 1005599146).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sommer, Martin, von Lauperswil, in Oberönz (Herzogenbuchsee), Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005599146, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
ImmobilienGenossenschaft Oberaargau, in Wiedlisbach, CHE-107.234.976, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 124 vom 30.06.2021, Publ. 1005233450).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Cattaneo-Rüegg, Katharina Agnes, von Mendrisio, in Herzogenbuchsee, Vizepräsidentin der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hofer, Thomas, von Thörigen, in Wiedlisbach, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bevilacqua-Zuber, Katja, von Madiswil, in Wiedlisbach, Vizepräsidentin der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Luder, Daniel, von Seeberg, in Lotzwil, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.