Reports for ILU AG, Zweigniederlassung Horw
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout ILU AG, Zweigniederlassung Horw
- ILU AG, Zweigniederlassung Horw with its legal headquarters in Horw is a Branch with head office in Switzerland from the sector «Architectural and engineering activities». ILU AG, Zweigniederlassung Horw is active.
- The company was founded on 22.02.1985.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 25.09.2020, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of LU is CHE-245.914.251.
- On the same address as ILU AG, Zweigniederlassung Horw there are 6 other active companies registered. These include: Autowerkstatt Thali GmbH, Eicher Design AG, Eicher Druck AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.02.1985
Legal form
Branch with head office in Switzerland
Legal headquarters of the company
Horw
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.9.011.543-2
UID/VAT
CHE-245.914.251
CHE-105.917.136 VAT
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Landschaftspflege, Landschaftsplanung, Landschaftsentwicklung, Geoinformatik, Projektierung und Bauleitung unter besonderer Berücksichtigung des Umweltschutzes; Beteiligungen; Übernahme von Vertretungen aller Art; Erwerb und Veräusserung von Liegenschaften.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Institut für Landschaftspflege und Umweltschutz ILU Fries Rutz Wanner AG, Zweigniederlassung Horw
- Institut für Landschaftspflege und Umweltschutz ILU Ottomar Lang AG, Zweigniederlassung Horw
- Institut für Landschaftspflege und Umweltschutz ILU Lang Ottomar AG, Zweigniederlassung Horw
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: ILU AG, Zweigniederlassung Horw
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004985915, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
ILU AG, Zweigniederlassung Horw, in Horw, CHE-245.914.251, schweizerische Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 99 vom 24.05.2007, S.6, Publ. 3945196).
Hauptsitz in:
Uster.
Neue Identifikationsnummer Hauptsitz:
CHE-105.917.136.
Angaben zur Zweigniederlassung neu:
[Die Zeichnungsberechtigten Josef Wanner, Felix Rutz und Dr. Markus Fries werden infolge Art. 110 HRegV gestrichen.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wanner, Josef, von Dagmersellen, in Dagmersellen, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Rutz, Felix, von Winterthur und Nesslau-Krummenau, in Regensberg, Mitglied, Sekretär, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Fries, Dr. Markus, von Triengen, in Bäretswil, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Lang, Jutta, von Uster, in Uster, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3945196, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Institut für Landschaftspflege und Umweltschutz ILU Fries Rutz Wanner AG, Zweigniederlassung Horw, in Horw, CH-100.9.011.543-2, Landschaftspflege, Landschaftsplanung, Landschaftsentwicklung, Geoinformatik, Projektierung und Bauleitung unter besonderer Berücksichtigung des Umweltschutzes, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 191 vom 06.10.2003, S. 10, Publ. 1201260).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Uster.
Firma neu:
ILU AG, Zweigniederlassung Horw.
Domizil neu:
Grisigenstrasse 6, 6048 Horw.
Firma Hauptsitz neu:
ILU AG.
Statuten Hauptsitz:
[Statutenänderung: 21.09.2006.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wanner, Josef, von Dagmersellen, in Dagmersellen, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Buchs LU, in Buchs LU];
Rutz, Felix, von Winterthur und Nesslau-Krummenau, in Regensberg, Mitglied und Sekretär, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Winterthur und Nesslau].
Publication number: 1201260, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Institut für Landschaftspflege und Umweltschutz ILU Ottomar Lang AG, Zweigniederlassung Horw, in Horw, Landschaftspflege, Landschaftsplanung, Landschaftsentwicklung, Landschaftsforschung, Projektierung und Bauleitung unter besonderer Berücksichtigung des Umweltschutzes, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 249 vom 24.12.2002, S. 12, Publ. 789280).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Uster.
Firma neu:
Institut für Landschaftspflege und Umweltschutz ILU Fries Rutz Wanner AG, Zweigniederlassung Horw.
Firma Hauptsitz neu:
Institut für Landschaftspflege und Umweltschutz ILU Fries Rutz Wanner AG.
Zweck Hauptsitz neu:
Landschaftspflege, Landschaftsplanung, Landschaftsentwicklung, Geoinformatik, Projektierung und Bauleitung unter besonderer Berücksichtigung des Umweltschutzes;
Beteiligungen;
Übernahme von Vertretungen aller Art;
Erwerb und Veräusserung von Liegenschaften.
Bemerkungen zum Hauptsitz:
[Statutenänderung: 30.06.2003.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lang, Ottomar, von Uster, in Uster, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wanner, Josef, von Buchs LU, in Buchs LU, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Leiter der Zweigniederlassung, mit Einzelprokura];
Rutz, Felix, von Winterthur und Nesslau, in Regensberg, Mitglied und Sekretär, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Fries, Dr. Markus, von Triengen, in Bäretswil, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Bachenbülach, ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien].