Address
Stationsstrasse 10c
8545 Rickenbach Sulz
Reports for IFCON GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout IFCON GmbH
- IFCON GmbH is active in the industry «Services regarding public relations» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Rickenbach Sulz.
- There are 3 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 23.05.2024.
- The company IFCON GmbH is registered under the UID CHE-105.617.220.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.08.2000
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Rickenbach (ZH)
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.022.150-1
UID/VAT
CHE-105.617.220
Sector
Services regarding public relations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Beratung im Bereich Bordunterhaltung, Kommunikation im und zum Flugzeug usw. (InFlight-Consulting), das International Fundraising Consulting (Spendenberatungen für nationale und internationale Organisationen), Immobilien Finanzierungen Consulting (Beratung bei Immobilien Finanzierungen) sowie andere Beratungen und Tätigkeiten aller Art in den erwähnten Gebieten. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, gleichartige oder ähnliche Unternehmungen erwerben, errichten oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben, verkaufen und belasten sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, welche geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: IFCON GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006037550, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
IFCON GmbH, in Rickenbach (ZH), CHE-105.617.220, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 139 vom 20.07.2018, Publ. 4371871).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Laasner, Diane Mary, von Elsau, in Rickenbach (ZH), Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 5 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Laasner, Gabriela, von Winterthur, in Rickenbach (ZH), Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 5 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, ohne Stammanteil].
Publication number: 4372953, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
IFCON GmbH, in Schlatt (TG), CHE-105.617.220, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 249 vom 23.12.2009, Publ. 5409310). Die Gesellschaft wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Rickenbach ZH im Handelsregister des Kantons Zürich eingetragen und im Handelsregister des Kantons Thurgau von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Publication number: 4371871, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
IFCON GmbH, bisher in Schlatt (TG), CHE-105.617.220, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 249 vom 23.12.2009, Publ. 5409310).
Statutenänderung:
03.07.2018.
Sitz neu:
Rickenbach (ZH).
Domizil neu:
Stationsstrasse 10c, 8545 Rickenbach Sulz.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Laasner, Karl, von Elsau, in Rickenbach (ZH), Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 15 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: in Schlatt (TG)];
Laasner, Diane Mary, von Elsau, in Rickenbach (ZH), Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 5 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: in Schlatt (TG)];
Laasner, Gabriela, von Winterthur, in Rickenbach (ZH), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Laasner, Peter, von Winterthur, in Rickenbach (ZH), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.