Reports for Icom Industrial Components AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Icom Industrial Components AG
- Icom Industrial Components AG from Bachenbülach operates in the sector «Trading in IT and communications products» and is active.
- There are 3 active persons registered in the management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 31.07.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-106.452.967.
- Companies with an identical address: Akropolis griechisch Food, Ibrahim, awse GmbH, CN Technik GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.04.1989
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bachenbülach
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.912.576-1
UID/VAT
CHE-106.452.967
Sector
Trading in IT and communications products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb eines technischen Handelsunternehmens für elektronische, elektromechanische und elektrische Halbfabrikate, Bauteile, Geräte und Zubehör für die industrielle Weiterverarbeitung. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BMO Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | Neuhausen am Rheinfall | 26.07.2016 | 22.09.2021 | |
niedermann treuhand gmbh | Schaffhausen | 15.05.2015 | 25.07.2016 | |
TT Tamagni Revision AG | Neuhausen am Rheinfall | <2004 | 14.05.2015 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Icom Industrial Components AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006097585, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Icom Industrial Components AG, in Bachenbülach, CHE-106.452.967, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 49 vom 10.03.2023, Publ. 1005697316).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stamm, Alain, von Aeschi bei Spiez, in Winterthur, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kruk, Peter, schwedischer Staatsangehöriger, in Bromma (SE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Klingenberg, Benjamin, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Gilten (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005697316, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Icom Industrial Components AG, in Bachenbülach, CHE-106.452.967, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 185 vom 23.09.2021, Publ. 1005296969).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stamm, Alain, von Aeschi bei Spiez, in Winterthur, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005296969, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Icom Industrial Components AG, in Bachenbülach, CHE-106.452.967, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 60 vom 26.03.2021, Publ. 1005134097). Gemäss Erklärung vom 14.09.2021 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Erne, Andrea, von Zürich, in Illnau-Effretikon, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Erne, Eveline, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Erne, Laura, von Zürich, in Illnau-Effretikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
BMO Wirtschaftsprüfung AG (CHE-100.786.275), in Neuhausen am Rheinfall, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zmijanjac, Bojan, von Dottikon, in Baden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.