Address
Rue de l'Eglise Catholique 8
1820 Montreux
Reports for ic.life Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout ic.life Sàrl
- ic.life Sàrl is currently active and the industry «Trading in food products». The legal headquarters are in Montreux.
- The management of the company ic.life Sàrl consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 10.06.2016.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 10.07.2023. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of VD is CHE-253.528.128.
- GTech conseil en électricité Sàrl, Luxury Rental Switzerland Sàrl are registered at the same address.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.06.2016
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Montreux
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.167.819-0
UID/VAT
CHE-253.528.128
Sector
Trading in food products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a le but suivant: La société a pour but de fournir des services de conseils, le commerce de marchandises de toutes sortes, la fabrication de produits finis, ainsi que leur commercialisation et leur distribution. Elle pourra en outre faire, soit pour son compte, soit pour le compte de tiers, toutes opérations financières, commerciales, mobilières ou immobilières se rattachant directement ou indirectement à son but social et s'intéresser, sous toutes formes, à toutes entreprises similaires, notamment par la prise de participation dans des entreprises similaires. La société pourra également constituer des succursales et des filiales en Suisse et à l'étranger.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- ic.life Ltd liab. Co
- ic.life GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: ic.life Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005791609, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
ic.life Sàrl, à Montreux, CHE-253.528.128 (FOSC du 27.10.2022, p. 0/1005592462). Statuts modifiés le 15.06.2023.
Nouveau but:
la société a le but suivant: La société a pour but de fournir des services de conseils, le commerce de marchandises de toutes sortes, la fabrication de produits finis, ainsi que leur commercialisation et leur distribution. Elle pourra en outre faire, soit pour son compte, soit pour le compte de tiers, toutes opérations financières, commerciales, mobilières ou immobilières se rattachant directement ou indirectement à son but social et s'intéresser, sous toutes formes, à toutes entreprises similaires, notamment par la prise de participation dans des entreprises similaires. La société pourra également constituer des succursales et des filiales en Suisse et à l'étranger. Zykovich Liudmila, qui n'est plus associée et dont la signature est radiée, cède ses 200 parts de CHF 100 à la gérante Berner Nadezhda, nouvelle associée, titulaire de 200 parts de CHF 100.
Publication number: HR02-1005592462, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
ic.life Sàrl, à Montreux, CHE-253.528.128 (FOSC du 12.08.2021, p. 0/1005269947). Zykovich Liudmila est désormais à Athènes (Grèce).
Publication number: HR02-1005269947, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
ic.life Sàrl, à Montreux, CHE-253.528.128 (FOSC du 22.06.2017, p. 0/3596943). Berner Nadezhda est désormais à Curno (Italie).
Nouvelle gérante avec signature individuelle:
Ivashchenko Anna, de et à Montreux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.