Reports for IBPS Switzerland
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout IBPS Switzerland
- IBPS Switzerland has its legal headquarters in Gelfingen and is active. It is a Foundation and active in the industry «Religious, political or secular associations».
- IBPS Switzerland has 6 persons entered in its management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 27.04.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The reported UID is CHE-110.401.223.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Li-Ya Chou,
Yuen Yi Liu,
Jui-Yi Lin,
Mei-Chu Fan,
Pei-Yi Tsai
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.09.1996
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Hitzkirch
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.7.018.889-1
UID/VAT
CHE-110.401.223
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Führung eines Zentrums für Chinesen und andere interessierte Personen in der Schweiz für gesellschaftliche, kulturelle und religiöse Anlässe, insbesondere auch für die Einführung von Kindern und Jugendlichen in die chinesische Sprache und Kultur; Beteiligung an wohltätigen Projekten und Institutionen in der ganzen Welt; Erwerb, Überbauung, Halten, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Liegenschaften; Aufnahme von Darlehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
von Allmen AG, Treuhandgesellschaft | Hünenberg | 08.08.2007 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: IBPS Switzerland
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005733350, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
IBPS Switzerland, in Hitzkirch, CHE-110.401.223, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 218 vom 09.11.2020, Publ. 1005017843).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wu, Yi Chen, australische Staatsangehörige, in Le Grand-Saconnex, Präsidentin, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Chiu, Sheung Lin Florence, britische Staatsangehörige, in Antwerpen (BE), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Lee, Yuen Ching, österreichische Staatsangehörige, in Wien (AT), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Houang, Ting Lai, französische Staatsangehörige, in Le Grand-Saconnex, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lin, Jui-Yi, taiwanische Staatsangehörige, in Hitzkirch, Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Vizepräsidentin, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Chou, Li-Ya, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Hitzkirch, Vizepräsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Berlin (DE), Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Liu, Yuen Yi, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Hitzkirch, Vizepräsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Berlin (DE), Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Fan, Mei-Chu, britische Staatsangehörige, in Paris (FR), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Tsai, Pei-Yi, taiwanische Staatsangehörige, in Genève, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005017843, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
IBPS Switzerland, in Hitzkirch, CHE-110.401.223, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 104 vom 03.06.2013, S.0, Publ. 7211544).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Chong, Suit Heong, Bürgerin von Malaysia, in Hitzkirch, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Huynh, Thanh Lan, von Hitzkirch, in Hitzkirch, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Chiu, Sheung Lin Florence, britische Staatsangehörige, in Antwerpen (BE), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Lee, Yuen Ching, österreichische Staatsangehörige, in Wien (AT), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Allmen AG, Treuhandgesellschaft (CHE-110.254.695), in Hünenberg, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Allmen AG, Treuhandgesellschaft, in Hünenberg (CH-170.3.026.650-0)].
Publication number: 7211544, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
IBPS Switzerland, in Hitzkirch, CH-100.7.018.889-1, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 46 vom 09.03.2009, S. 12, Publ. 4916410).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Huynh Luu, Le Thuong, von Visp, in Visp, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Trinh, Kiet Gia, australische Staatsangehörige, in Le Grand-Saconnex, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Chou, Li-Ya, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Berlin (DE), Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Liu, Yuen Yi, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Berlin (DE), Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.