Reports for Ibercultura GmbH, Luzern
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Ibercultura GmbH, Luzern
- Ibercultura GmbH, Luzern has its legal headquarters in Luzern and is active. It operates in the sector «Trading with recreational products».
- The management has one active person registered.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 08.03.2016, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of LU is CHE-107.871.427.
- There are currently 2 trademarks or applications for the company Ibercultura GmbH, Luzern in the IPI database.
- Coiffeur Next Level GmbH, Vincenzo Style & Gossip GmbH, Yoko Fashion - Edith Meyer-Arnet are registered at the same address.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.06.1977
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.4.011.635-6
UID/VAT
CHE-107.871.427
Sector
Trading with recreational products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Vertrieb und Handel mit Fernkursen, Schulungsbüchern und pädagogischen Unterrichtsmitteln, wie Schallplatten und Kassetten, sowie Im- und Export gleicher Artikel und Handel mit einschlägigen Produkten; Beteiligungen; Erwerb, Verkauf und Belastung von Patenten, Lizenzen sowie anderen immateriellen Werten.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Ibercultura GmbH Luzern
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
ACCADEMIA | 15.12.1988 | deleted | 01201/1988 |
SCUOLA RADIO ELETTRA | 18.04.1988 | deleted | 01202/1988 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Ibercultura GmbH, Luzern
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2709703, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Ibercultura GmbH, Luzern, in Luzern, CHE-107.871.427, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 233 vom 01.12.2008, Publ. 4757304).
Domizil neu:
Dornacherstrasse 9, 6003 Luzern. Nebenleistungspflichten gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen erfolgen brieflich.
Vinkulierung neu:
Vom Gesetz abweichende Abtretungsmodalitäten der Stammanteile gemäss Statuten.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Garcia-Requejo, Rosa Maria, spanische Staatsangehörige, in Luzern, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 20'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
del Olmo Rodriguez, María Fátima, von Dallenwil, in Oberdorf (NW), Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 20'000.00.
Publication number: 4757304, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Ibercultura GmbH, Luzern, in Luzern, CH-100.4.011.635-6, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 13 vom 19.01.2005, S. 9, Publ. 2647732). Gemäss Erklärung der Geschäftsführung vom 18.11.2008 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Publication number: 2647732, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Ibercultura GmbH, Luzern, in Luzern, CH-100.4.011.635-6, Vertrieb und Handel mit Fernkursen, Schulungsbüchern und pädagogischen Unterrichtsmitteln, wie Schallplatten und Cassetten, sowie Im- und Export gleicher Artikel und Handel mit einschlägigen... Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 32 vom 18.02.1992, S. 742).
Statutenänderung:
12.01.2005.
Zweck neu:
Vertrieb und Handel mit Fernkursen, Schulungsbüchern und pädagogischen Unterrichtsmitteln, wie Schallplatten und Kassetten, sowie Im- und Export gleicher Artikel und Handel mit einschlägigen Produkten;
Beteiligungen;
Erwerb, Verkauf und Belastung von Patenten, Lizenzen sowie anderen immateriellen Werten.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Garcia-Manueco, Baldomero, spanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Luzern, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 10'000.--.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Garcia-Requejo, Rosa Maria, spanische Staatsangehörige, in Luzern, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 20'000.-- [bisher: mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 10'000.--].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.