Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Address
c/o Homburger AG
Hardstrasse 201
8005 Zürich
Reports for IAE Services AG in Liquidation
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.12.1984
Deletion from the commercial register
25.09.2019
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.912.506-0
UID/VAT
CHE-100.505.967
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb und Aufbau von Büros auf der ganzen Welt an durch die IAE International Aero Engines AG bestimmten Orten, um Dienstleistungen in technischen Angelegenheiten sowie in Führungs- und Verwaltungsangelegenheiten zwischen der IAE International Aero Engines AG und ihren Kunden, seien es Flugzeughersteller oder Fluggesellschaften, zu erbringen.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Bern | 23.10.2008 | 23.01.2017 | |
Deloitte AG | Zürich | <2004 | 22.10.2008 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- IAE Services AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: IAE Services AG in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR03-1004723274, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
IAE Services AG in Liquidation, in Zürich, CHE-100.505.967, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 16 vom 24.01.2017, S.0, Publ. 3300997). Die Liquidation ist beendet. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: 3300997, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
IAE Services AG, in Zürich, CHE-100.505.967, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 85 vom 03.05.2016, Publ. 2812677).
Statutenänderung:
14.11.2016.
Firma neu:
IAE Services AG in Liquidation.
Vinkulierung neu:
[Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist im Sinne von Art. 685a Abs. 3 OR aufgehoben.]. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.]. Gemäss Erklärung vom 14.11.2016 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 14.11.2016 aufgelöst.
Liquidationsadresse:
c/o Homburger AG, Hardstrasse 201, 8005 Zürich.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG (CHE-308.775.052), in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Grüninger, Dr. Harold, von Basel, in Meilen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 2812677, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
IAE Services AG, in Zürich, CHE-100.505.967, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 176 vom 11.09.2015, Publ. 2368329).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gross, Balz P., von Greifensee, in Greifensee, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wedeles, Thomas Kiefer, amerikanischer Staatsangehöriger, in West Hartford (CT/US), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates und Sekretär und Direktor, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Perrault, Alicia Marie, amerikanische Staatsangehörige, in Cromwell (CT/US), Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates und Sekretärin und Direktorin, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Grüninger, Dr. Harold, von Basel, in Meilen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG (CHE-308.775.052), in Bern, Revisionsstelle [bisher: PricewaterhouseCoopers AG (CH-035.9.019.917-2)].