Reports for Hubertus Design GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Hubertus Design GmbH
- Hubertus Design GmbH is a Limited liability company with its legal headquarters in Zürich. Hubertus Design GmbH belongs to the industry «Operation of design, graphics and jewellery studios» and is currently active.
- The management has 2 active persons registered.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 09.06.2021. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register ZH under the UID CHE-313.483.431.
- On the same address there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: Circle 4 Motors AG, uniq solution gmbh.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.09.2011
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.045.827-0
UID/VAT
CHE-313.483.431
Sector
Operation of design, graphics and jewellery studios
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Erbringen von integrierten Beratungs- und Design-Dienstleistungen auf den Gebieten Corporate und Brand Identity, Grafik, Editorial Design, Informations- und Ausstellungsdesign, Live Communication, Kommunikation und digitale Medien sowie die Entwicklung und Realisation von eigenen Projekten. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Hubertus Design GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005210723, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Hubertus Design GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-313.483.431, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 207 vom 26.10.2015, S.0, Publ. 2444153).
Domizil neu:
Müllerstrasse 34a, 8004 Zürich.
Publication number: 2444153, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Hubertus Design GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-313.483.431, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 54 vom 19.03.2014, Publ. 1404561).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Roffler, Benjamin, von Churwalden, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 5 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Landis, Kerstin Jane, von Urdorf, in Zürich, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 7 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: mit 4 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00];
Vögeli, Jonas, von Böttstein, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 13 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: mit 11 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00].
Publication number: 1404561, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Hubertus Design GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-313.483.431, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 181 vom 19.09.2011, Publ. 6340068).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Blaas, Vinzenz, von Grabs, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 5 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Schubiger, Philipp, von Gommiswald, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 5 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Landis, Kerstin Jane, von Urdorf, in Zürich, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 4 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Vögeli, Jonas, von Böttstein, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 11 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien und mit 5 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.