Reports for HUBERLAB.AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout HUBERLAB.AG
- HUBERLAB.AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Aesch BL. HUBERLAB.AG belongs to the industry «Trading with various goods» and is currently active.
- HUBERLAB.AG has 6 persons entered in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 22.07.2024.
- The company's UID is CHE-107.941.358.
Management (6)
newest board members
Joyce Ann Heidinger,
Brian Michael Wall,
Benjamin Ross Travis
newest authorized signatories
Fatbardh Xhema,
Joyce Ann Heidinger,
Nicola Mele,
Brian Michael Wall,
Benjamin Ross Travis
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.06.1968
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Aesch (BL)
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.3.916.713-5
UID/VAT
CHE-107.941.358
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Handel mit Artikeln für den Labor- und Spitalbedarf und die Erbringung von damit zusammenhängenden Beratungsdienstleistungen. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke im In- und Ausland erwerben, halten und veräussern und alle finanziellen, kommerziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft direkt oder indirekt im Zusammenhang stehen. Sie ist insbesondere berechtigt, Gesellschaften im In- und Ausland zu gründen/zu errichten oder sich an diesen zu beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten. Die Gesellschaft ist Teil einer Gruppe von Gesellschaften und kann bei der Verfolgung ihres Gesellschaftszwecks die Interessen dieser Gruppe berücksichtigen. Insbesondere kann die Gesellschaft ihren direkten und indirekten Tochtergesellschaften sowie Dritten, einschliesslich ihren direkten und indirekten Aktionären sowie deren direkten und indirekten Tochtergesellschaften, Darlehen und andere direkte oder indirekte Finanzierungen gewähren, einschliesslich im Rahmen von Cash Pooling Vereinbarungen, und für deren Verbindlichkeiten Sicherheiten aller Art stellen, einschliesslich mittels Pfandrechten an oder fiduziarischen Übereignungen von Aktiven der Gesellschaft oder Garantien jedwelcher Art, ob entgeltlich oder nicht.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Avanta Audit AG | Baar | 15.12.2022 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Zürich | 11.02.2022 | 14.12.2022 | |
Urs Baumann & Partner AG | Reinach (BL) | 08.05.2019 | 10.02.2022 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- HUBERLAB.LTD
- Huber & Co. AG, Reinach
- Huber & Co AG, Reinach
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: HUBERLAB.AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006090458, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
HUBERLAB.AG, in Aesch (BL), CHE-107.941.358, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 126 vom 03.07.2023, Publ. 1005784624).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Duchaussoy, Michael, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Breisach am Rhein (DE), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Xhema, Fatbardh, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Rheinfelden, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005784624, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
HUBERLAB.AG, in Aesch (BL), CHE-107.941.358, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 121 vom 26.06.2023, Publ. 1005777869).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Heidinger, Joyce Ann, kanadische Staatsangehörige, in Holland, Ohio (US), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005777869, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
HUBERLAB.AG, in Aesch (BL), CHE-107.941.358, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 244 vom 15.12.2022, Publ. 1005629331).
Statutenänderung:
24.05.2023.
Mitteilungen neu:
Alle Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief, Telefax oder E-Mail unter Vorbehalt abweichender gesetzlicher oder statuarischer Bestimmungen.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.