Reports for Horseshoe Gastro AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Horseshoe Gastro AG
- Horseshoe Gastro AG has its legal headquarters in Oberarth and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Operation of restaurants».
- There are 5 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 05.10.2022.
- In the commercial register the company Horseshoe Gastro AG is registered under the UID CHE-361.345.493.
Management (5)
newest board members
Debora Annen,
Nadja Annen,
Tim Annen,
Martin Annen jun.,
Cornelia Annen-Kenel
newest authorized signatories
Debora Annen,
Nadja Annen,
Tim Annen,
Martin Annen jun.,
Cornelia Annen-Kenel
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.06.2020
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Arth
Commercial Registry Office
SZ
Commercial register number
CH-130.3.028.211-8
UID/VAT
CHE-361.345.493
Sector
Operation of restaurants
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb eines Restaurants und einer Bar. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
MARQUART TREUHAND AG | Zürich | 02.07.2020 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Horseshoe Gastro AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005575854, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Horseshoe Gastro AG, in Arth, CHE-361.345.493, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 126 vom 02.07.2020, Publ. 1004926468).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Reichlin, Marcel Samuel, von Muotathal, in Sattel, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Annen-Kenel, Cornelia, von Arth, in Arth, Mitglied und Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Annen-Kenel, Martin, von Arth, in Arth, Präsident und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Annen, Debora, von Arth, in Arth, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Annen, Nadja, von Arth, in Arth, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Annen, Tim, von Arth, in Arth, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR01-1004926468, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Horseshoe Gastro AG, in Arth, CHE-361.345.493, Gotthardstrasse 5, 6414 Oberarth, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
19.06.2020.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb eines Restaurants und einer Bar. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 105'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 105'000.00.
Aktien:
1'050 Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände:
Sacheinlage/Sachübernahme: Die Gesellschaft übernimmt bei der Gründung das Geschäft des im Handelsregister eingetragenen Einzelunternehmens Martin Annen, Restaurant Schöntal, in Arth (CHE-113.747.592), gemäss dem öffentlich beurkundeten Vermögensübertragungsvertrag vom 19.06.2020 und Bilanz per 31.12.2019 mit Aktiven (inklusive der darin enthaltenden Grundstücke GB Arth Nr. 492, 1374 und 3277) von CHF 6'562'633.51 und Fremdkapital von CHF 6'434'171.45, wofür 1'050 Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00 ausgegeben und CHF 23'462.06 als Forderung gutgeschrieben werden.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt.
Eingetragene Personen:
Annen-Kenel, Martin, von Arth, in Arth, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Annen-Kenel, Cornelia, von Arth, in Arth, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Reichlin, Marcel Samuel, von Muotathal, in Sattel, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
MARQUART TREUHAND AG (CHE-103.137.328), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.