Reports for Holzbautech Rotten AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Holzbautech Rotten AG
- Holzbautech Rotten AG is currently active and the industry «Production and processing of wooden goods». The legal headquarters are in Oberwald.
- The management consists of 2 persons. The company was founded on 19.07.1996.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 29.11.2019, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of VS under the UID CHE-108.033.570.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.07.1996
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Obergoms
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-600.3.001.977-0
UID/VAT
CHE-108.033.570
Sector
Production and processing of wooden goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb einer Schreinerei und Zimmerei und überhaupt Ausführung sämtlicher Holzbauarbeiten. Kann sich an andern Unternehmungen beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zu-sammenschliessen sowie Rechte, Lizenzen und Patente erwerben und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
APROA AG | Visp | 20.04.2016 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Schwestermann & Michel Treuhand AG | Fiesch | <2004 | 19.04.2016 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Holzbautech Rotten AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004771578, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Holzbautech Rotten AG, in Obergoms, CHE-108.033.570, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 76 vom 20.04.2016, S.0, Publ. 2790111).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kreuzer, Sergio, von Obergoms, in Oberwald (Obergoms), Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 2790111, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Holzbautech Rotten AG, in Obergoms, CHE-108.033.570, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 129 vom 08.07.2013, Publ. 963035).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schwestermann & Michel Treuhand AG, in Fiesch, Revisionsstelle;
Zumoberhaus, Alfred, genannt Fredi, von Oberwald, in Oberwald (Obergoms), Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kreuzer, Armin, von Obergoms, in Oberwald (Obergoms), einziges Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Oberwald, Präsident mit Einzelunterschrift];
APROA AG (CHE-105.896.391), in Visp, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 963035, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Holzbautech Rotten AG, in Oberwald, CH-600.3.001.977-0, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 162 vom 23.08.2007, S. 17, Publ. 4077936).
Sitz neu:
Obergoms.
Domizil neu:
Dorfstrasse 1, 3999 Oberwald.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bellwalder, Josef, von Oberwald, in Oberwald, Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zumoberhaus, Alfred, genannt Fredi, von Oberwald, in Oberwald (Obergoms), Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten [bisher: Zumoberhaus, Fredi, von Oberwald, in Oberwald].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.